EP1561239 - ATOMIC LAYER DEPOSITION METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way, MS 525 Boise, ID 83716 / US | [2011/17] |
Former [2005/32] | For all designated states Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way, MS 525 Boise, ID 83716 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOAN, Trung, Tri 101 Lausen Court Los Gaton, CA 95032 / US | 02 /
BLALOCK, Guy, T. 2178 Nrth Greenvieuw Court Eagle, ID 83616 / US | 03 /
SANDHU, Gurtej, S. 2964 East Parkriver Drive Boise, ID 83706 / US | [2005/32] | Representative(s) | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | ||
Former [2005/32] | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk, Patent Attorneys, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 03783399.3 | 12.11.2003 | [2005/32] | WO2003US36223 | Priority number, date | US20020293072 | 12.11.2002 Original published format: US 293072 | [2005/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004044963 | Date: | 27.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1561239 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1561239 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/285 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
C23C16/38 (EP,US);
H01L21/20 (KR);
H01L21/0228 (EP,US);
C23C16/403 (EP,US);
C23C16/45542 (EP,US);
C23C16/515 (EP,US);
H01L21/02274 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/28562 (EP,US);
H01L21/3141 (US);
H01L21/76841 (EP,US);
H01L21/02178 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02183 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02186 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02205 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/31616 (US);
H01L21/31683 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/17] |
Former [2005/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ATOMSCHICHTABSCHEIDUNG | [2005/32] | English: | ATOMIC LAYER DEPOSITION METHODS | [2005/32] | French: | PROCEDES DE DEPOT DE COUCHE ATOMIQUE | [2005/32] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.05.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 21.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.04.2011 | BE | 27.04.2011 | CY | 27.04.2011 | CZ | 27.04.2011 | DK | 27.04.2011 | EE | 27.04.2011 | FI | 27.04.2011 | HU | 27.04.2011 | NL | 27.04.2011 | RO | 27.04.2011 | SE | 27.04.2011 | SI | 27.04.2011 | SK | 27.04.2011 | TR | 27.04.2011 | BG | 27.07.2011 | GR | 28.07.2011 | ES | 07.08.2011 | PT | 29.08.2011 | GB | 12.11.2011 | IE | 12.11.2011 | LU | 12.11.2011 | CH | 30.11.2011 | FR | 30.11.2011 | LI | 30.11.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
TR | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
GB | 12.11.2011 | ||
IE | 12.11.2011 | ||
LU | 12.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
GB | 12.11.2011 | ||
IE | 12.11.2011 | ||
LU | 12.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
GB | 12.11.2011 | ||
IE | 12.11.2011 | ||
LU | 12.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/04] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
GB | 12.11.2011 | ||
IE | 12.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
FR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
GB | 12.11.2011 | ||
IE | 12.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/46] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
GB | 12.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/29] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 29.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1167567 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 64-71 * column 5, line 19 - column 6, line 36 * * column 8, line 17 - line 35; figures 5,12,13 *; | [A]US2002000598 (KANG SANG-BOM [KR], et al) [A] 64-71 * page 3, paragraph 40 * * page 3, paragraph 43 - page 4, paragraph 45; figures 1ab,2ab *; | [DA]US6343565 (HONGOH TOSHIAKI [JP]) [DA] 1-50 * column 1, line 1 - column 5, line 64 * * column 6, line 48 - column 7, line 39; figures 1,2,5 *; | [XA]WO0243114 (SIMPLUS SYSTEMS CORP [US]) [X] 51-58,62,63,72,74-80,82-86,88,90-92,94-98 * the whole document * [A] 64-71; | [DA]US6399520 (KAWAKAMI SATORU [JP], et al) [DA] 1-50 * column 5, line 33 - column 16, line 21; figures 3-5 *; | [XA]WO0245871 (ANGSTRON SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 72,75-77,83,86-88,95,98,99 * the whole document * [A] 1-50,81,93; | [A]US2002076507 (CHIANG TONY P [US], et al) [A] 1,2,6,7,10-16,18-29,33,37-45,48-51,64 * page 8, column R, paragraph 120 - page 9, column L, paragraph 130 * * page 13, column L, paragraph 174 - page 17, column R, paragraph 221; figures 13,34-38; claim 1 *; | [PX]US2002197856 (MATSUSE KIMIHIRO [JP], et al) [PX] 1,6-10,15-21,25-34,40-48 * page 4, column R, paragraph 49 - page 6, column L, paragraph 60 * * page 6, column R, paragraph 65 - page 8, column L, paragraph 72 * * page 9, column R, paragraph 83 - page 11, column L, paragraph 92 * * page 11, column R, paragraph 98 - paragraph 99; figures 5,7,8,12 *; | [PX]WO03087431 (MICRON TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [PX] 1,6-10,15-21,25-33,40-48 * the whole document *; | [E]US2004038525 (MENG SHUANG [US], et al) [E] 51,52,62,63 * page 2, paragraph 31 - page 4, paragraph 39 * * page 6, paragraph 49 ** page 9, paragraph 83; figures 1-3 * |