EP1569593 - OSCILLATORY CHEST WALL COMPRESSION DEVICE WITH IMPROVED AIR PULSE GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): GR | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hill-Rom Services Pte. Ltd. 1 Yishun Avenue 7 Singapore 768923 / SG | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/36] | For all designated states Hill-Rom Services, Inc. 1069 State Route 46 East Batesville, IN 47006 / US | ||
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states Advanced Respiratory, Inc. 1020 County Road F Saint-Paul, MN 55126-2910 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN BRUNT, Nicholas, P. One Bald Eagle Island White Bear Lake, MN 55110 / US | 02 /
KIVISTO, John, A. 3367 221st Avenue NW Oak Grove, MN 55303 / US | 03 /
STECHMANN, Eric, L. 3460 Harriet Court Shoreview, MN 55126 / US | 04 /
WEBER, Mark, A. 2586 Southlawn Drive Maplewood, MN 55109 / US | 05 /
GAGNE, Donald, J. 2828 Condit Street Little Canada, MN 55117 / US | [2005/36] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2007/52] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2005/36] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 03783542.8 | 14.11.2003 | [2005/36] | WO2003US36569 | Priority number, date | US20020298242 | 15.11.2002 Original published format: US 298242 | US20020298240 | 15.11.2002 Original published format: US 298240 | US20020295782 | 15.11.2002 Original published format: US 295782 | US20020298211 | 15.11.2002 Original published format: US 298211 | US20020298272 | 15.11.2002 Original published format: US 298272 | US20020298245 | 15.11.2002 Original published format: US 298245 | US20020298167 | 15.11.2002 Original published format: US 298167 | US20020298267 | 15.11.2002 Original published format: US 298267 | [2005/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004045485 | Date: | 03.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1569593 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1569593 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61H23/02, A61H31/00 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
A61H9/0078 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0103 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1238 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5007 (EP,US);
A61H2201/501 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5043 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5058 (EP,US);
A61H2205/08 (EP,US);
A61H9/0071 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/36] | Title | German: | SCHWINGBRUSTWANDKOMPRIMIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT VERBESSERTEMLUFTIMPULSGENERATOR | [2005/36] | English: | OSCILLATORY CHEST WALL COMPRESSION DEVICE WITH IMPROVED AIR PULSE GENERATOR | [2005/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF OSCILLATOIRE DE COMPRESSION DE LA CAGE THORACIQUE DOTE D'UN GENERATEUR PERFECTIONNE D'AIR PULSE | [2005/36] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 05.08.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 01.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12158841.2 / EP2520268 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.11.2003 | AT | 16.10.2013 | BE | 16.10.2013 | BG | 16.10.2013 | CY | 16.10.2013 | CZ | 16.10.2013 | DK | 16.10.2013 | EE | 16.10.2013 | ES | 16.10.2013 | FI | 16.10.2013 | IT | 16.10.2013 | MC | 16.10.2013 | NL | 16.10.2013 | RO | 16.10.2013 | SE | 16.10.2013 | SI | 16.10.2013 | SK | 16.10.2013 | TR | 16.10.2013 | IE | 14.11.2013 | LU | 14.11.2013 | CH | 30.11.2013 | LI | 30.11.2013 | GR | 17.01.2014 | PT | 17.02.2014 | [2016/28] |
Former [2015/38] | HU | 14.11.2003 | |
AT | 16.10.2013 | ||
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
GR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
TR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 14.11.2013 | ||
LU | 14.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 14.11.2003 | |
AT | 16.10.2013 | ||
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
TR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 14.11.2013 | ||
LU | 14.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
TR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 14.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 14.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 14.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 16.10.2013 | |
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 16.10.2013 | |
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4433068 (HEWLETT PACKARD GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]US5551843 (HAUSER ERWIN [DE]) [X] 1-13* the whole document *; | [X]DE19726281 (INGERSOLL RAND CO [US]) [X] 1-13 * figure -; claims 1-5 *; | [X]WO0206673 (ELECTROMED INC [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * figure -; claim - * | International search | [Y]US5056505 (WARWICK WARREN J [US], et al); | [Y]US5830164 (CONE ALAN C [US], et al); | [A]US6179793 (ROTHMAN NEIL S [US], et al); | [X]US6254556 (HANSEN CRAIG N [US], et al) |