EP1567070 - ADJUSTABLE LENGTH TAP AND METHOD FOR DRILLING AND TAPPING A BORE IN BONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synthes GmbH Eimattstrasse 3 4436 Oberdorf / CH | [2009/42] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states Zwirnmann, Ralph 1591 Edgewood Ave. Roslyn, PA 19001-1520 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zwirnmann, Ralph F. 720 Cedar Hill Road Ambler, PA 19002 / US | [2009/42] |
Former [2005/35] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Moreland, David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | Moreland, David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | ||
Former [2005/35] | Moreland, David, et al Marks & Clerk Scotland 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 03783566.7 | 13.11.2003 | [2005/35] | WO2003US36619 | Priority number, date | US20020292515 | 13.11.2002 Original published format: US 292515 | [2005/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004043270 | Date: | 27.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1567070 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1567070 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/16 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
A61B17/1633 (EP,US);
A61B17/16 (KR);
A61B17/1655 (EP,US);
A61B17/32 (KR);
A61B2017/00907 (EP,US);
A61B2090/036 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/35] | Title | German: | GEWINDEBOHRER MIT VERSTELLBARER LÄNGE ZUM BOHREN UND GEWINDESCHNEIDEN EINER BOHRUNG IN KNOCHEN | [2005/35] | English: | ADJUSTABLE LENGTH TAP AND METHOD FOR DRILLING AND TAPPING A BORE IN BONE | [2005/35] | French: | TARAUDAGE A LONGUEUR REGLABLE ET PROCEDE POUR PERCER ET TARAUDER UN ORIFICE DANS UN OS | [2005/35] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 26.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.04.2012 | 17.04.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.11.2003 | AT | 26.12.2012 | BE | 26.12.2012 | CY | 26.12.2012 | CZ | 26.12.2012 | DK | 26.12.2012 | EE | 26.12.2012 | FI | 26.12.2012 | MC | 26.12.2012 | NL | 26.12.2012 | RO | 26.12.2012 | SE | 26.12.2012 | SI | 26.12.2012 | SK | 26.12.2012 | TR | 26.12.2012 | BG | 26.03.2013 | GR | 27.03.2013 | ES | 06.04.2013 | PT | 26.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
TR | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 26.12.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4341206 (PERRETT T ROBERT, et al) [X] 1-6,10-22 * column 3, line 30 - column 5, line 63 * * figures 3-5 * [Y] 7-9,23; | [XY]DE3800482 (LIST HEINZ JUERGEN [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,19-22 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 49 * * figures 3-7 * [Y] 23; | [Y]US4549538 (SCHADRACK III WILLIAM C [US], et al) [Y] 7-9,23 * column 5, lines 9-25 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5409490 (ETHRIDGE J KENDALL [US]) [A] 1,22,23 * column 5, line 42 - column 6, line 7 * * figure 6 * | Examination | DE3622676 |