EP1560624 - A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ANCHORING OF PACING LEADS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pressure Products Medical Supplies, Inc. 1861 North Gaffey B San Pedro, CA 90731 / US | For all designated states Kurth, Paul A. 1045 La Vista Road Santa Barbara, CA 93110 / US | [2005/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURTH, Paul, A. 1045 La Vista Road Santa Barbara, CA 93110 / US | 02 /
WORLEY, Seth, J. 1525 Hillcrest Road Lancaster, PA 17603 / US | [2005/32] | Representative(s) | Duxbury, Stephen, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bavariaring 17 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/32] | Duxbury, Stephen, et al Arnold & Siedsma Isartorplatz 5 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03783697.0 | 17.11.2003 | [2005/32] | WO2003US37045 | Priority number, date | US20020426773P | 15.11.2002 Original published format: US 426773 P | US20030464437P | 22.04.2003 Original published format: US 464437 P | US20030476487P | 06.06.2003 Original published format: US 476487 P | US20030479399P | 18.06.2003 Original published format: US 479399 P | [2005/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004045675 | Date: | 03.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1560624 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/00 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
A61N1/0587 (EP,US);
A61N1/0573 (EP,US);
A61N2001/0585 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERûT ZUR VERANKERUNG VON SCHRITTMACHER-ABLEITUNGEN | [2005/32] | English: | A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ANCHORING OF PACING LEADS | [2005/32] | French: | METHODE ET APPAREIL D'ANCRAGE D'ELECTRODES DE STIMULATION | [2005/32] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2005 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 21.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/48] | 10.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP]US6592552 (SCHMIDT CECIL C [US]); | [XP]US6629987 (GAMBALE RICHARD A [US], et al) | by applicant | US5125904 | US5312355 | US5792118 |