EP1546206 - Novel immunogenic lipopeptides comprising T-helper and cytotoxic T lymphocyte (CTL) epitiopes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/26] | NOVEL IMMUNOGENIC LIPOPEPTIDES COMPRISING T-HELPER AND CYTOTOXIC T LYMPHOCYTE (CTL) EPITOPES | ||
[2014/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2015 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE COUNCIL OF THE QUEENSLAND INSTITUTE OF MEDICAL RESEARCH 300 Herston Road Herston, QLD 4029 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2014/51] | For all designated states THE COUNCIL OF THE QUEENSLAND INSTITUTE OF MEDICAL RESEARCH 300 Herston Road Herston, QLD 4029 / AU | ||
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states THE COUNCIL OF THE QUEENSLAND INSTITUTE OF MEDICAL RESEARCH 300 Herston Road Herston, QLD 4029 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACKSON, David 74 Woodville Street North Balwyn, Victoria 3104 / AU | 02 /
ZENG, Weiguang 46 Mercantile Parade Kensington, Victoria 3031 / AU | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/51] | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2008/03] | Dempster, Robert Charles D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2005/26] | Soames, Candida Jane D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03783852.1 | 12.08.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003AU01019 | Priority number, date | US20020403328P | 12.08.2002 Original published format: US 403328 P | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004014957 | Date: | 19.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1546206 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1546206 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 19.02.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/385, A61K39/39, C07K14/005, C07K14/195 | [2014/28] | CPC: |
A61K39/39 (EP,US);
C07K19/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
A61K39/02 (KR);
A61K39/07 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K39/145 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/29 (EP,US);
A61K39/385 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C07K14/195 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5158 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55516 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55544 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55566 (EP,US);
A61K2039/57 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6018 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6031 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6037 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6075 (EP,US);
C12N2760/16122 (EP,US);
C12N2760/16134 (EP,US);
C12N2760/18422 (EP,US);
C12N2770/24222 (EP,US);
C12N2770/24234 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/26] | C07K19/00, A61K39/145, A61K39/29, A61K39/02, A61K39/00, A61P31/14, A61P31/16, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Title | German: | Neue immunogene Lipopeptide, die T-Helfer- und zytotoxische-T-Lymphozyten-(CTL)-Epitope enthalten | [2014/28] | English: | Novel immunogenic lipopeptides comprising T-helper and cytotoxic T lymphocyte (CTL) epitiopes | [2014/28] | French: | Nouveaux lipopeptides immunogènes comprenant des epitopes de lymphocytes T auxiliaires et de lymphocytes T cytotoxiques (CTL) | [2014/28] |
Former [2005/26] | NEUE IMMUNOGENE LIPOPEPTIDE, DIE T-HELFER- UND CYTOTOXIC-T-LYMPHOCYTE-(CLT-)EPITOPE ENTHALTEN | ||
Former [2005/26] | NOVEL IMMUNOGENIC LIPOPEPTIDES COMPRISING T-HELPER AND CYTOTOXIC T LYMPHOCYTE (CTL) EPITOPES | ||
Former [2005/26] | NOUVEAUX LIPOPEPTIDES IMMUNOGENES COMPRENANT DES EPITOPES DE LYMPHOCYTES T AUXILIAIRES ET DE LYMPHOCYTES T CYTOTOXIQUES (CTL) | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 28.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 28.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 10.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10011465.1 / EP2314630 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/48] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.05.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 06.05.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.05.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.08.2003 | AT | 17.12.2014 | BE | 17.12.2014 | BG | 17.12.2014 | CY | 17.12.2014 | CZ | 17.12.2014 | DK | 17.12.2014 | EE | 17.12.2014 | FI | 17.12.2014 | MC | 17.12.2014 | NL | 17.12.2014 | RO | 17.12.2014 | SE | 17.12.2014 | SI | 17.12.2014 | SK | 17.12.2014 | TR | 17.12.2014 | GR | 18.03.2015 | PT | 17.04.2015 | GB | 12.08.2015 | IE | 12.08.2015 | IT | 12.08.2015 | LU | 12.08.2015 | ES | 13.08.2015 | CH | 31.08.2015 | FR | 31.08.2015 | LI | 31.08.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/04] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
GB | 12.08.2015 | ||
IE | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LU | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 13.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
GB | 12.08.2015 | ||
IE | 12.08.2015 | ||
LU | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 13.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
GB | 12.08.2015 | ||
IE | 12.08.2015 | ||
LU | 12.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
FR | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
GB | 12.08.2015 | ||
IE | 12.08.2015 | ||
LU | 12.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
IE | 12.08.2015 | ||
LU | 12.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
LU | 12.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
LU | 12.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
LU | 12.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
LU | 12.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | EE | 17.12.2014 | |
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
PT | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | FI | 17.12.2014 | |
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 17.12.2014 | |
SE | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 17.12.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9322343 (UNIV ROCKEFELLER [US], et al); |