EP1527226 - IRONING BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Freudenberg KG Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2005/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WENDELKEN, Hans-Jürgen Rauchäcker-Ring 7 74889 Sinsheim / DE | 02 /
WOLF, Joachim Kolpingstr. 14 69469 Weinheim / DE | 03 /
FLATH, Johannes Siegfriedstr. 6A 68519 Viernheim / DE | 04 /
HELMERKING, Barbara Im Steiler 53 69469 Weinheim / DE | 05 /
TINTELNOT, Carl-Uwe Hubestrasse 7 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2006/50] |
Former [2005/18] | 01 /
WENDELKEN, Hans-Jürgen Rauchäcker-Ring 7 74889 Sinsheim / DE | ||
02 /
WOLF, Joachim Kolpingstr. 14 69469 Weinheim / DE | |||
03 /
FLATH, Johannes Zwerggewann 23 69124 Heidelberg / DE | |||
04 /
HELMERKING, Barbara Im Steiler 53 69469 Weinheim / DE | |||
05 /
TINTELNOT, Carl-Uwe Hubestrasse 7 69469 Weinheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 03784029.5 | 19.07.2003 | [2005/18] | WO2003EP07903 | Priority number, date | DE2002135655 | 02.08.2002 Original published format: DE 10235655 | [2005/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004015191 | Date: | 19.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1527226 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | D06F81/10, D06F81/14 | [2005/18] | CPC: |
D06F83/00 (EP,US);
D06F81/10 (EP,US);
D06F81/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BÜGELTISCH | [2005/18] | English: | IRONING BOARD | [2005/18] | French: | PLANCHE A REPASSER | [2005/18] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 18.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/34] | 06.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH04354999 ; | [XA]US2504560 (WILLIAM MCCRORY) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 5 - line 35 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 5,6 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930428), vol. 017, no. 216, Database accession no. (C - 1053), & JP04354999 A 19921209 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-4,7-10 * abstract * | Examination | GB2116216 |