EP1539722 - THIAZOLE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUBA, Wolfgang Am Ruettacker 3 79379 Muellheim / DE | 02 /
MATTEI, Patrizio Doernliweg 33 CH-4125 Riehen / CH | 03 /
NEIDHART, Werner 9, rue du Steinler F-68220 Hagenthal-le-Bas / FR | 04 /
NETTEKOVEN, Matthias, Heinrich Winkelmatten 9 79639 Grenzach-Wyhlen / DE | 05 /
PFLIEGER, Philippe 1, rue du Vignoble F-68130 Schwoben / FR | [2006/51] |
Former [2005/24] | 01 /
GUBA, Wolfgang Frankenstrasse 7 79379 Muellheim / DE | ||
02 /
MATTEI, Patrizio Doernliweg 33 CH-4125 Riehen / CH | |||
03 /
NEIDHART, Werner 9, rue du Steinler F-68220 Hagenthal-le-Bas / FR | |||
04 /
NETTEKOVEN, Matthias, Heinrich Bandweg 10 79639 Grenzach-Wyhlen / DE | |||
05 /
PFLIEGER, Philippe 1, rue du Vignoble F-68130 Schwoben / FR | Representative(s) | Waschbüsch, Klaus, et al 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basle / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | Waschbüsch, Klaus, Dr., et al 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basle / CH | Application number, filing date | 03784122.8 | 31.07.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003EP08473 | Priority number, date | EP20020017677 | 07.08.2002 Original published format: EP 02017677 | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004014884 | Date: | 19.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1539722 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07D277/56, C07D417/06 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
C07D417/06 (EP,US);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THIAZOLDERIVATE | [2005/24] | English: | THIAZOLE DERIVATIVES | [2005/24] | French: | DERIVES DE THIAZOLE | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 15.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/21] | 08.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9921845 (AGOURON PHARMA [US], et al) [A] 1-28* example -; claim - *; | [A]WO9962892 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-28 * example -; claim - *; | [A]WO0164675 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-28 * example -; claim - * |