EP1536793 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING FK506 DERIVATIVES AND THE IR USE FOR THE TREATMENT OF ALLERGIC DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.12.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.02.2006 [2006/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sucampo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 4733 Bethesda Avenue, Suite 450 Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | [2005/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UENO, Ryuji 11025 Stanmore Drive, Potomac Montgomery, MD 20854 / US | [2005/23] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/23] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 03784593.0 | 08.08.2003 | [2005/23] | WO2003JP10105 | Priority number, date | US20020402061P | 09.08.2002 Original published format: US 402061 P | [2005/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004014373 | Date: | 19.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1536793 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/436, A61P27/02 | [2005/23] | CPC: |
A61K31/4745 (EP,US);
A61K31/436 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0048 (EP,US);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/14 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPHTHALMISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ENTHALTEND DERIVATIVE VON FK506 UND DEREN VERWENDUNG IN DER BEHANDLUNG VON AUGENALLERGIEN | [2005/23] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING FK506 DERIVATIVES AND THE IR USE FOR THE TREATMENT OF ALLERGIC DISEASES | [2005/23] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES COMPRENANT DES DERIVES DE FK506, ET LEUR UTILISATION POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'AFFECTIONS ALLERGIQUES | [2005/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 19.12.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0406791 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 12,13,16,17,20-22 * page 6, line 51 * * claims 1-3 *; | [X]EP0484936 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 12,13,16,17,20-22 * page 6, lines 28,29 * * Prescription 4-6;; claims 1,4 *; | [X]WO9219278 (UNIV KURUME [JP]) [X] 1-34 * page 1, lines 9-11 * * claims 1,2,5,8 * * page 2, lines 1-4 * * page 8, lines 1-15 * * page 11, lines 1,2 * * examples 1,2 *; | [X]WO0066122 (R TECH UENO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-34 * page 1, lines 15,16 * * example 1 *; | [PX]WO02085359 (SUCAMPO AG [CH], et al) [PX] 12,13,16,17,20-23 * page 15, lines 10-13 * * page 16, lines 16-19 * * page 18, lines 14-21 * * example -; claims 1,2,4,14; table - *; | [PX]WO03043650 (SUCAMPO AG [CH], et al) [PX] 1-34 * claims 1,4,6,12,15,17,18,31,33,34; table 1 *; | [A] - "FUJISAWA Protopic (tacrolimus) FOR DERMATOLOGIC USE ONLY NOT FOR OPHTHALMIC use", INTERNET, (200012), URL: http://www.protopic.com/img/protopic_pi.pdf, (20030205), XP002230797 [A] 1-34 * the whole document * |