EP1540809 - LOW VOLTAGE, TWO-LEVEL, SIX-PULSE INDUCTION MOTOR CONTROLLER DRIVING A MEDIUM-TO-HIGH VOLTAGE, THREE-OR-MORE-LEVEL AC DRIVE INVERTER BRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMC Electrical Products, Inc. P.O. Box 880 Barboursville, WV 22504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Smc Electrical Products, Inc. P.O. Box 880 Barboursville, WV 22504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOJIMA, Geraldo 1641 Berkshire Hill Drive Duluth, GA 30097-4310 / US | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/24] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al PAGE WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 03784748.0 | 31.07.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003US19887 | Priority number, date | US20020399355P | 31.07.2002 Original published format: US 399355 P | US20030453817P | 12.03.2003 Original published format: US 453817 P | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004015851 | Date: | 19.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1540809 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.04.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02P5/34, H02P7/42 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
H02M7/487 (EP,US);
H02P21/00 (KR);
H02M7/53876 (EP,US);
H02P27/04 (KR);
H02P27/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INDUKTIONSMOTORSTEUERUNG MIT NIEDRIGER SPANNUNG, ZWEI PEGELN UND SECHS IMPULSEN ZUR ANSTEUERUNG EINER WECHSELSTROMANSTEUERWECHSELRICHTERBR CKE F R MITTLERE BIS HOHE SPANNUNG UND DREI ODER MEHR PEGELN | [2005/24] | English: | LOW VOLTAGE, TWO-LEVEL, SIX-PULSE INDUCTION MOTOR CONTROLLER DRIVING A MEDIUM-TO-HIGH VOLTAGE, THREE-OR-MORE-LEVEL AC DRIVE INVERTER BRIDGE | [2005/24] | French: | UNITE DE COMMANDE DE MOTEUR A INDUCTION BASSE TENSION, SIX IMPULSIONS, A DEUX NIVEAUX, ENTRAINANT UN PONT INVERSEUR, A TROIS NIVEAUX, OU PLUS, D'ENTRAINEMENT EN COURANT ALTERNATIF, DE TENSION MOYENNE A ELEVEE | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 29.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/47] | 16.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.03.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.02.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 07.02.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.03.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0512531 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,19,25-28,36 * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 40; figures 1,2,6,8 * * page 7, line 15 - line 33 * * page 8, line 6 - page 9, line 37 * [Y] 2,9,18,20; | [A]US5517401 (KINOSHITA SHIGENORI [JP], et al) [A] * column 7, line 12 - line 64; figure 9 *; | [Y]US5977741 (DELANGE ROBERT J [US], et al) [Y] 2,9,18,20 * column 8, line 25 - column 9, line 38; figures 1,6 * | International search | [Y]US5463296 (FUGERE MICHAEL A [US], et al); | [Y]US5977741 (DELANGE ROBERT J [US], et al); | [A]US6118932 (MAURIO JOSEPH M [US], et al); | [Y]US6166514 (ANDO TAKESHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US6232742 (WACKNOV JOEL B [US], et al); | [Y]US6242884 (LIPO THOMAS A [US], et al); | [X]US6369543 (MASSELUS JEAN-EMMANUEL [BE], et al) |