EP1527523 - CHANNEL SWITCHING FOR SUPPORT OF MULTIMEDIA BROADCAST AND MULTICAST SERVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2017/23] |
Former [2012/50] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | ||
Former [2005/18] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION Suite 527, 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERRY, Stephen, E. 15 Summit Avenue Northport, NY 11768 / US | [2005/18] | Representative(s) | HGF Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/23] | HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2013/40] | Jennings, Vincent Louis Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2012/50] | Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2005/18] | Pierrou, Mattias Awapatent AB, P.O. Box 45 086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 03784933.8 | 06.08.2003 | [2005/18] | WO2003US24543 | Priority number, date | US20020402161P | 07.08.2002 Original published format: US 402161 P | [2005/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004015876 | Date: | 19.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1527523 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1527523 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.05.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/06 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
H04W4/06 (EP,BR,KR,NO,US);
H04L12/189 (EP,BR,KR,NO,US);
H04W72/30 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04B7/0617 (KR);
H04W72/1263 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04W72/20 (BR,NO,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/19] | H04W72/00, H04W88/18 | ||
Former IPC [2010/32] | H04W4/06 | ||
Former IPC [2005/19] | H04Q7/00, H04Q7/30 | ||
Former IPC [2005/18] | H04B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/23] |
Former [2005/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KANALUMSCHALTUNG ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON MULTIMEDIA-BROADCAST- UND MULTIMEDIA- MULTICASTDIENSTEN | [2005/18] | English: | CHANNEL SWITCHING FOR SUPPORT OF MULTIMEDIA BROADCAST AND MULTICAST SERVICES | [2005/18] | French: | COMMUTATION DE VOIES POUR LA PRISE EN CHARGE DE LA DIFFUSION DE DONNEES MULTIMEDIA ET DE SERVICES MULTIDIFFUSION | [2005/18] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 27.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12193703.1 / EP2579624 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.06.2017 | CZ | 07.06.2017 | DK | 07.06.2017 | FI | 07.06.2017 | IT | 07.06.2017 | MC | 07.06.2017 | PT | 07.06.2017 | RO | 07.06.2017 | SE | 07.06.2017 | SI | 07.06.2017 | TR | 07.06.2017 | LU | 06.08.2017 | BG | 07.09.2017 | [2020/28] |
Former [2020/15] | CY | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
TR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LU | 06.08.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | CY | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
LU | 06.08.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | CZ | 07.06.2017 | |
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
LU | 06.08.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 07.06.2017 | |
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 07.06.2017 | |
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | CZ | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | CZ | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 07.06.2017 | |
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5920817 (UMEDA NARUMI [JP], et al); | [A]EP1059823 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [I]US2002018450 (MCKENNA DANIEL B [US], et al); | [A]US2002057663 (LIM BYUNG KEUN [KR]); | International search | [Y]US5475861 (HALL SCOTT M [US]); | [YP]US2003033253 (RHODES N LEE [US]) | by applicant | US5920817 | US2002018450 |