EP1547037 - SYSTEM FOR SPATIALLY ADJUSTABLE EXCITATION OF LEADLESS MINIATURE MARKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calypso Medical Technologies, INC. Suite 1550, 2101 Fourth Avenue Seattle, WA 98121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states Calypso Medical Technologies, Inc. Suite 1550, 2101 Fourth Avenue Seattle, WA 98121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIMMER, Steven C. 12810 NE 32nd Place Bellevue, WA 98005 / US | 02 /
WRIGHT, J. Nelson 7605 78th Avenue SE Mercer Island, WA 98040 / US | 03 /
MAYO, William T. 4333 Dogwood Avenue Seal Beach, CA 90740 / US | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2005/26] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03785102.9 | 07.08.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003US24956 | Priority number, date | US20020213980 | 07.08.2002 Original published format: US 213980 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004015642 | Date: | 19.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1547037 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.02.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/14 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
G08B13/2414 (EP,US);
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
A61B5/06 (EP,US);
A61B5/062 (EP,US);
A61B90/36 (EP,US);
H01Q7/08 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00154 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00411 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3958 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3975 (EP,US);
A61N2005/1051 (EP,US);
A61N5/1049 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR RÄUMLICH EINSTELLBAREN ERREGUNG EINER DRAHTLOSEN MINIATURMARKIERUNG | [2005/26] | English: | SYSTEM FOR SPATIALLY ADJUSTABLE EXCITATION OF LEADLESS MINIATURE MARKER | [2005/26] | French: | SYSTEME POUR UNE EXCITATION SPATIALEMENT REGLABLE DE MARQUEURS MINIATURES SANS BROCHES | [2005/26] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 17.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 18.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/38] | 21.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4795995 (ECCLESTON LARRY [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 21 * * column 12, line 58 - column 13, line 59; figures 1,8 * [Y] 2-5,7-19; | [Y]US6081238 (ALICOT JORGE [US]) [Y] 2-5,7-19 * column 13, line 40 - column 14, line 43 * * column 19, line 45 - line 65 ** figures 10,27 * | International search | [A]US4795995 (ECCLESTON LARRY [US], et al); | [A]US4123749 (HARTMANN ERNST G, et al); | [A]US5142292 (CHANG LUKE C [US]); | [A]US4633250 (ANDERSON III PHILIP M [US], et al); | [A]US4260990 (LICHTBLAU GEORGE J) | by applicant | US5815076 | US4795995 |