EP1575739 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CENTRALLY TIGHTENING ROTATINGLY DRIVABLE PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2007 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marquart, Ingeborg Untere Schlosshalde 29 78351 Bodman / DE | [2005/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARQUART, Uwe Untere Schlosshalde 29 78351 Bodman / DE | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Gahlert, Stefan, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Gahlert, Stefan, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2005/38] | Gahlert, Stefan, et al Witte, Weller & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 105462 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 03785719.0 | 03.12.2003 | [2005/38] | WO2003EP13617 | Priority number, date | DE2002159257 | 11.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10259257 | [2005/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004052592 | Date: | 24.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1575739 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1575739 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q17/22, B23Q3/18, B24B41/06, B23B31/02 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
B23B31/36 (EP,US);
B23Q17/2216 (EP,US);
B23Q3/183 (EP,US);
B23Q3/186 (EP,US);
B24B19/04 (EP,US);
B24B3/02 (EP,US);
B24B3/24 (EP,US);
B24B41/067 (EP,US);
Y10T279/1274 (EP,US);
Y10T279/14 (EP,US);
Y10T279/19 (EP,US);
Y10T279/1906 (EP,US);
Y10T279/21 (EP,US);
Y10T279/26 (EP,US);
Y10T279/29 (EP,US);
Y10T409/304312 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/38] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ZENTRIERTEN SPANNEN VON ROTIEREND ANTREIBBAREN TEILEN | [2005/38] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CENTRALLY TIGHTENING ROTATINGLY DRIVABLE PARTS | [2005/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE SERRAGE CENTRE DE PIECES DESTINEES A ETRE ENTRAINEES PAR ROTATION | [2005/38] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 13.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.09.2006 | CZ | 27.09.2006 | EE | 27.09.2006 | FI | 27.09.2006 | GB | 27.09.2006 | IE | 27.09.2006 | NL | 27.09.2006 | RO | 27.09.2006 | SI | 27.09.2006 | SK | 27.09.2006 | TR | 27.09.2006 | AT | 03.12.2006 | LU | 03.12.2006 | BG | 27.12.2006 | DK | 27.12.2006 | SE | 27.12.2006 | GR | 28.12.2006 | BE | 31.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | ES | 07.01.2007 | PT | 13.03.2007 | HU | 28.03.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
EE | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
GB | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
TR | 27.09.2006 | ||
AT | 03.12.2006 | ||
LU | 03.12.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
HU | 28.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
EE | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
GB | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
AT | 03.12.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
HU | 28.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
EE | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
GB | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
AT | 03.12.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
GB | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
AT | 03.12.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
GB | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
AT | 03.12.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
GB | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/45] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
IE | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
ES | 07.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
NL | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3544117 (BINGHAM SPENCER LEWIS) [X] 1,4,5,12,17 * the whole document * [Y] 2; | [A]US5427484 (GALLI RONALD A [US]) [A] 1,17* figures 1,4 *; | [YA]WO0013069 (ANCA PTY LTD [AU], et al) [Y] 2 * the whole document * [A] 1,17 |