EP1592602 - SUPPORTING STRUCTURE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/52] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUMANN, Karl-Heinz Brühlstrasse 3 71149 Bondorf / DE | 02 /
KREMPELS, Uwe Humboldtstrasse 20 71032 Böblingen / DE | 03 /
RUF, Jochen Schauinslandstrasse 11 75177 Pforzheim / DE | [2005/45] | Representative(s) | Rauscher, Steffen Daimler AG IPM/B, C 106 70546 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Rauscher, Steffen DaimlerChrysler AG IPM/B, C 106 70546 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 03785905.5 | 20.12.2003 | [2005/45] | WO2003EP14682 | Priority number, date | DE2003105910 | 13.02.2003 Original published format: DE 10305910 | [2005/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004071851 | Date: | 26.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1592602 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B62D21/15 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
B62D21/152 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2006/22] |
Former [2005/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | TRAGSTRUKTUR FÜR EINEN KRAFTWAGEN | [2005/45] | English: | SUPPORTING STRUCTURE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2005/45] | French: | STRUCTURE PORTANTE DE V HICULE MOTEUR | [2005/45] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 19.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH10226363 ; | [X]JPH02212280 ; | [X]EP0978442 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]WO02068256 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH07267148 ; | [X]US5348113 (DRVOTA JIRI [CS], et al) [X] 1-4 * figures 1,3-5 *; | [X]US6027159 (BAUMANN KARL-HEINZ [DE]) [X] 1-4 * column 5, lines 8-11; figures 4-6 *; | [A]US3881742 (FELZER BERTOLD) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP1044863 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [DA] 1-4 * paragraphs [0016] , [0020] - [0022]; figures 1,5,6; claims 1-8 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10226363 A 19980825 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [X] 1-4 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901113), vol. 014, no. 514, Database accession no. (M - 1046), & JP02212280 A 19900823 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-4 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP07267148 A 19951017 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-4 * abstract * |