EP1608353 - PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF BREAST CANCER WITH 4-HYDROXY TAMOXIFEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Besins Healthcare Luxembourg SARL 67 boulevard Grande-Duchesse Charlotte 1331 Luxembourg / LU | [2011/02] |
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states LABORATOIRES BESINS INTERNATIONAL 3, rue du Bourg l'Abbé 75003 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALIN-DROUIN, Dominique 32, rue des Gatines F-91370 Verrières-le-Buisson / FR | 02 /
WEPIERRE, Jacques 1, rue Valoise F-77166 Grisy Suisnes / FR | 03 /
ROUANET, Philippe 154, rue des Quatre Seigneurs F-34090 Montpellier / FR | [2005/52] | Representative(s) | Brown, David Leslie Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/05] | Brown, David Leslie Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2012/36] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2008/35] | Nargolwalla, Cyra Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2005/52] | Nargolwalla, Cyra Cabinet Plasseraud 65/67, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03785958.4 | 15.12.2003 | [2005/52] | WO2003EP15029 | Priority number, date | US20030458963P | 01.04.2003 Original published format: US 458963 P | [2005/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004087123 | Date: | 14.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1608353 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1608353 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K31/138, A61K31/137, A61K47/14 | [2013/13] | CPC: |
A61K31/137 (EP);
A61K31/138 (EP);
A61K47/14 (EP);
A61K9/0014 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61K47/38 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/52] | A61K31/138, A61P35/00, A61K47/14, A61K47/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/52] | Title | German: | VORBEUGUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON BRUSTKREBS MIT 4-HYDROXY TAMOXIFEN | [2005/52] | English: | PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF BREAST CANCER WITH 4-HYDROXY TAMOXIFEN | [2005/52] | French: | PREVENTION ET TRAITEMENT DU CANCER DU SEIN A L'AIDE DE 4-HYDROXY TAMOXIFENE | [2005/52] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 25.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08103007.4 / EP1952810 | EP08103014.0 / EP1941871 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2006 | Opposition(s) | 02.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2003 | AT | 30.04.2014 | BE | 30.04.2014 | CY | 30.04.2014 | CZ | 30.04.2014 | DK | 30.04.2014 | EE | 30.04.2014 | FI | 30.04.2014 | MC | 30.04.2014 | RO | 30.04.2014 | SE | 30.04.2014 | SI | 30.04.2014 | SK | 30.04.2014 | TR | 30.04.2014 | BG | 30.07.2014 | GR | 31.07.2014 | PT | 01.09.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/27] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
BE | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 30.04.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4973755 (GRAFE INGOMAR [DE], et al) [X] 1-22 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - line 31 * * column 10, line 1 - line 40 *; | [X]US4919937 (MAUVAIS-JARVIS PIERRE [FR], et al) [X] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [XA]US5904930 (FISCHER WILFRIED [DE], et al) [X] 1-12,22 * the whole document * [A] ; | [XA]WO9736570 (S W PATENTVERWERTUNGS GES M B [AT], et al) [X] 10-14,22 * page 8, line 15 - line 25 * * page 9, line 26 - page 11, line 9 * * examples 4,5 * [A] ; | [X] - MAUVAIS-JARVIS P ET AL, "TRANS-4 HYDROXYTAMOXIFEN CONCENTRATION AND METABOLISM AFTER LOCAL PERCUTANEOUS ADMINISTRATION TO HUMAN BREAST", CANCER RESEARCH, (1986), vol. 46, no. 3, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 1521 - 1525, XP009030099 [X] 1-11 * abstract * * page 1522, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 1525, column L, line 30 - line 32 * * page 1525, column L, line 42 - line 49 * | [X] - KUTTENN F ET AL, "Basis for percutaneous administration of antiestrogens in breast pathology", CONTRACEPTION FERTILITE SEXUALITE 1991 FRANCE, (1991), vol. 19, no. 2, ISSN 0980-3904, pages 165 - 171, XP001180881 [X] 1-9 * abstract * * page 169 - page 170 * | [PX] - SIMONY-LAFONTAINE I ET AL, "Neoadjuvant percutaneous-4-hydroxytamoxifen decreases breast cancer cell proliferation: A prospective randomizediimage analysis Study.", ANALYTICAL CELLULAR PATHOLOGY, 9th International Conference on Applied Genomics-European Society for Analytical Cellular Pathology/;Amsterdam, Netherlands; October 01-04, 2003, (2003), vol. 25, no. 5-6, ISSN 0921-8912, pages 258 - 259, XP009030125 [PX] 1-11 * the whole document * | Examination | WO2004054557 | WO2004054558 |