EP1581681 - METHOD AND MACHINE WITH ROTATING DRUM FOR THE DYEING TREATMENT OF TEXTILE ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/40] | METHOD AND MACHINE WITH ROTATING DRUM FOR THE WASHING OR DYEING TREATMENT OF TEXTILE ARTICLES | ||
[2006/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tonello S.r.l. Via della Fisica, 1/3 36030 Sarcedo (Vicenza) / IT | [2005/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TONELLO, Osvaldo Via Costa, 15 I-36030 Sarcedo / IT | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | Crippa, Paolo Ernesto, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza Mario Saggin, 2 35131 Padova / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | Crippa, Paolo Ernesto, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Berchet, 9 35131 Padova / IT | ||
Former [2006/04] | Gallo, Luca, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Berchet, 9 I-35131 Padova / IT | ||
Former [2005/40] | Gerbino, Angelo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Berchet 9 35131 Padova / IT | Application number, filing date | 03786215.8 | 18.12.2003 | [2005/40] | WO2003IT00832 | Priority number, date | IT2002VI00272 | 18.12.2002 Original published format: IT VI20020272 | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004055252 | Date: | 01.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1581681 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1581681 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1581681 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | D06F35/00 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
D06B3/30 (EP,US);
D06F35/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND MASCHINE MIT EINER ROTIERENDEN TROMMEL ZUR FÄRBBEHANDLUNG VON TEXTILARTIKELN | [2006/31] | English: | METHOD AND MACHINE WITH ROTATING DRUM FOR THE DYEING TREATMENT OF TEXTILE ARTICLES | [2006/33] | French: | PROCEDE ET MACHINE A TAMBOUR ROTATIF POUR LA TEINTURE D'ARTICLES TEXTILES | [2006/31] |
Former [2005/40] | VERFAHREN UND MASCHINE MIT EINER ROTIERENDEN TROMMEL ZUR WASCH- ODER FÄRBBEHANDLUNG VON TEXTILARTIKELN | ||
Former [2005/40] | METHOD AND MACHINE WITH ROTATING DRUM FOR THE WASHING OR DYEING TREATMENT OF TEXTILE ARTICLES | ||
Former [2005/40] | PROCEDE ET MACHINE A TAMBOUR ROTATIF POUR LE LAVAGE ET LA TEINTURE D'ARTICLES TEXTILES | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 21.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.02.2006 | BE | 01.02.2006 | CH | 01.02.2006 | CY | 01.02.2006 | CZ | 01.02.2006 | EE | 01.02.2006 | FI | 01.02.2006 | FR | 01.02.2006 | LI | 01.02.2006 | NL | 01.02.2006 | RO | 01.02.2006 | SI | 01.02.2006 | SK | 01.02.2006 | TR | 01.02.2006 | BG | 01.05.2006 | DK | 01.05.2006 | SE | 01.05.2006 | GR | 02.05.2006 | DE | 03.05.2006 | ES | 12.05.2006 | PT | 03.07.2006 | HU | 02.08.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2009/01] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
CY | 01.02.2006 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2006 | ||
EE | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
FR | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
RO | 01.02.2006 | ||
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
TR | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
GR | 02.05.2006 | ||
DE | 03.05.2006 | ||
ES | 12.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
HU | 02.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2006 | ||
EE | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
RO | 01.02.2006 | ||
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
TR | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
GR | 02.05.2006 | ||
DE | 03.05.2006 | ||
ES | 12.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
HU | 02.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2006 | ||
EE | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
RO | 01.02.2006 | ||
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
GR | 02.05.2006 | ||
DE | 03.05.2006 | ||
ES | 12.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
HU | 02.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2006 | ||
EE | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
RO | 01.02.2006 | ||
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
GR | 02.05.2006 | ||
DE | 03.05.2006 | ||
ES | 12.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
RO | 01.02.2006 | ||
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
GR | 02.05.2006 | ||
DE | 03.05.2006 | ||
ES | 12.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
RO | 01.02.2006 | ||
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
GR | 02.05.2006 | ||
DE | 03.05.2006 | ||
ES | 12.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
RO | 01.02.2006 | ||
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
DE | 03.05.2006 | ||
ES | 12.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
IT | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
RO | 01.02.2006 | ||
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
DE | 03.05.2006 | ||
ES | 12.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
DE | 03.05.2006 | ||
ES | 12.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
ES | 12.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
ES | 12.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
BG | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
ES | 12.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
ES | 12.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
ES | 12.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
ES | 12.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 01.02.2006 | |
SI | 01.02.2006 | ||
ES | 12.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 01.02.2006 | |
ES | 12.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | ES | 12.05.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2000051563 ; | [X]JPH1017689 ; | [X]DE3805803 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 11-14* column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 23; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0404047 (VELLATI PIERINO [IT]) [X] 1-4,7-10 * the whole document *; | [X]DE4310595 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1-4,7-10 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000914), vol. 2000, no. 05, & JP2000051563 A 20000222 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1,5,6 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010605), vol. 2000, no. 18, & JP1017689 A 19890120 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,8 * abstract * |