EP1563169 - DEVICES AND METHODS FOR REDUCTION OF NOX EMISSIONS FROM LEAN BURN ENGINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Engine Intellectual Property Company, LLC 2701 Navistar Drive, Suite 7-3E-P23-2 Lisle, IL 60532 / US | [2013/37] |
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states Eaton Corporation 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44114-2584 / US | ||
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states Catalytica Energy Systems, Inc. 430 Ferguson Drive Mountain View, CA 94043-5272 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DALLA BETTA, Ralph, A. 865 Doverton Square Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 02 /
CIZERON, Joel 530 La Conner Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 03 /
SHERIDAN, David, R. 945 Berkeley Avenue Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2007/09] |
Former [2005/33] | 01 /
DALLA BETTA, Ralph, A. 865 Doverton Square Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | ||
02 /
CIZERON, Joel 845 Mowry Ave., Apt. 148 Fremont, CA 94536 / US | |||
03 /
SHERIDAN, David, R. 945 Berkeley Avenue Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | Representative(s) | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/37] | Price, Nigel John King, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2005/33] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03786881.7 | 17.11.2003 | [2005/33] | WO2003US37022 | Priority number, date | US20020426604P | 15.11.2002 Original published format: US 426604 P | [2005/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004046514 | Date: | 03.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1563169 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/20 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
F01N13/009 (EP,US);
F01N13/0093 (EP,US);
F01N3/0814 (EP,US);
F01N3/0842 (EP,US);
F01N3/0871 (EP,US);
F01N3/2053 (EP,US);
F01N3/2066 (EP,US);
F01N2240/20 (EP,US);
F01N2240/30 (EP,US);
F01N2610/03 (EP,US);
F01N2610/04 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND METHODE ZUR REDUKTION DER NOX-EMISSIONEN IN EINEM MAGERMOTOR | [2005/33] | English: | DEVICES AND METHODS FOR REDUCTION OF NOX EMISSIONS FROM LEAN BURN ENGINES | [2005/33] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCEDES POUR REDUIRE LES EMISSIONS DE NOX DE MOTEURS A MELANGE PAUVRE | [2015/21] |
Former [2005/33] | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCEDES POUR REDUIRE LES EMISSIONS DE NO SB X /SB DE MOTEURS A MELANGE PAUVRE | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 30.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/14] | 17.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1211394 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1-65 * column 3, line 51 - column 5, line 48; figure 1 *; | [DX]EP0537968 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [DX] 1-65 * abstract *; | [X]US2001041153 (BENZ UWE [DE]) [X] 1-65 * abstract *; | [A]JPS6368714 ; | [A]US2002038542 (AKAMA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-65 * abstract *; | [A]US5921076 (KRUTZSCH BERND [DE], et al) [A] 1-65 * abstract *; | [A]DE10018792 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-65 * abstract *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880810), vol. 012, no. 292, Database accession no. (M - 729), & JP63068714 A 19880328 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-65 * abstract * | [A] - JONES M R ET AL, EXHAUST-GAS REFPORMING OF HYDROCARBON FUELS, SAE TECHNICAL PAPER SERIES, SOCIETY OF AUTOMOTIVE ENGINEERS, WARRENDALE, PA, US, PAGE(S) 223-234, ISSN 0148-7191, XP008010384 [A] 1-65 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6161378 | US5968463 | WO0134950 | US5441401 | EP0537968 |