EP1588443 - INERT ANODE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcoa USA Corp. 201 Isabella Street Pittsburgh, PA 15212-5858 / US | [2018/31] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states Alcoa Inc. Alcoa Corporate Center, 201 Isabella Street Pittsburgh, PA 15212-5858 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
D'ASTOLFO, LeRoy E., @Alcoa Inc. Alcoa Tech. Center 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, PA 15069-0001 / US | 02 /
BATES, Calvin, @Alcoa Inc. Alcoa Technical Center 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, PA 15069-0001 / US | [2019/02] |
Former [2005/43] | 01 /
D'ASTOLFO, LeRoy E., Alcoa Inc. Alcoa Tech. Center, 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, PA 15069-0001 / US | ||
02 /
BATES, Calvin, Alcoa Inc. Alcoa Technical Center, 100 Technical Drive Alcoa Center, PA 15069-0001 / US | Representative(s) | Barton, Matthew Thomas, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [2019/02] |
Former [2012/13] | Barton, Matthew Thomas, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/22] | Barton, Matthew Thomas, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/43] | Parry, Simon James Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03786931.0 | 19.11.2003 | [2005/43] | WO2003US37195 | Priority number, date | US20020428818P | 25.11.2002 Original published format: US 428818 P | US20030713798 | 13.11.2003 Original published format: US 713798 | [2018/33] |
Former [2005/43] | US20020428818P | 25.11.2002 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004049467 | Date: | 10.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1588443 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1588443 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.12.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C25C3/12 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
C25C3/12 (EP,US);
C25C3/08 (EP,US);
C25C3/16 (EP,US);
C25C7/025 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/43] | H01M6/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/02] |
Former [2005/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | INERTE ANODENANORDNUNG | [2005/43] | English: | INERT ANODE ASSEMBLY | [2005/43] | French: | ENSEMBLE A ANODE INERTE | [2005/43] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/43] | 03.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13183888.0 / EP2688130 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.11.2003 | AT | 09.01.2019 | CY | 09.01.2019 | CZ | 09.01.2019 | DK | 09.01.2019 | EE | 09.01.2019 | ES | 09.01.2019 | FI | 09.01.2019 | IT | 09.01.2019 | MC | 09.01.2019 | NL | 09.01.2019 | RO | 09.01.2019 | SE | 09.01.2019 | SI | 09.01.2019 | TR | 09.01.2019 | BG | 09.04.2019 | GR | 10.04.2019 | PT | 09.05.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
DK | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 09.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2160562 (ALUSUISSE) [A] 1* page 7, line 5 - line 29 *; | [Y]US4057480 (ALDER HANSPETER) [Y] 1-5,7,8,13 * column 6, line 25 - line 35 * * column 6, line 65 - column 7, line 6 * * figures 5,6 *; | [Y]EP0322326 (ELECTRODES & REFRACTAIRES [FR]) [Y] 1-5,7,8,13 * page 3, line 40 - page 4, line 41 * | International search | [X]US5098530 (SUDHOELTER RAINER [DE], et al); | [XP]US2003209426 (SLAUGENHAUPT MICHAEL L [US], et al) | by applicant | US6126799 | US6217739 | US6372119 | US6423195 |