EP1570375 - SYSTEM AND METHOD OF CREATING, AGGREGATING, AND TRANSFERRING ENVIRONMENTAL EMISSION REDUCTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AgCert International, plc 30 Herbert Street Dublin 2 / IE | [2006/05] |
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states Agcert International, LLC 1901 South Harbour City Blvd., Suite 300 Melbourne, FL 32901 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCMORRIS III, John A. 542 Sanderling Drive Indialantic, FL 32903 / US | 02 /
BOLTON, George D. 116 Signature Drive Melbourne, FL 32951 / US | 03 /
TANK, Alan R. 5324 Portsmouth Road Bethesda, MD 30816 / US | 04 /
HOWARD, Everett E. (Tracy) 14595 101 Street Fellsmere, FL 32948 / US | 05 /
SMYRNIOS, Lewis C. 270 Robert Way South Satellite Beach, FL 32937 / US | [2005/36] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2005/36] | Jackson, Richard Eric Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03787035.9 | 24.11.2003 | [2005/36] | WO2003US37428 | Priority number, date | US20020429267P | 26.11.2002 Original published format: US 429267 P | US20030440069P | 13.01.2003 Original published format: US 440069 P | US20030498992P | 29.08.2003 Original published format: US 498992 P | US20030513498P | 22.10.2003 Original published format: US 513498 P | [2005/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004049316 | Date: | 10.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1570375 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/00, G06F17/60 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
G06Q30/08 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0635 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06393 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0201 (EP,US);
G06Q40/04 (EP,US);
G01N33/18 (EP,US);
Y02P90/845 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERZEUGEN,AGGREGIEREN UND TRANSFERIEREN VON UMWELTEMISSIONSREDUKTIONEN | [2005/36] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD OF CREATING, AGGREGATING, AND TRANSFERRING ENVIRONMENTAL EMISSION REDUCTIONS | [2005/36] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR LA CREATION, L'AGREGATION ET LE TRANSFERT DE REDUCTIONS DES EMISSIONS DANS L'ENVIRONNEMENT | [2005/36] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 15.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 19.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/09] | 14.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L] - The technical aspects identified in the present application (Art. 92 EPC) are considered part of common general knowledge. Due to their notoriety no documentary evidence is found to be required. For further details see the reference below., XP002456252 [L] 1-58 | International search | [Y]US6253191 (HOFFMAN CHERYL [US]); | [Y]US6336096 (JERNBERG DONALD V [US]); | [Y]US2002143693 (SOESTBERGEN MARK VAN [US], et al); | [Y]US2002173979 (DAGGETT DENNIS G [US], et al); | [Y]US2002173980 (DAGGETT DENNIS G [US], et al) |