EP1573471 - VALIDATING AN ELECTRONIC TRANSACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | [2009/27] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states ELECTRONIC DATA SYSTEMS CORPORATION 5400 Legacy Drive H3-3A-05 Plano, TX 75024 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONSON, Duke, G. 500 Farms Road McKinney, TX 75071 / US | 02 /
YE, Jianjun 8509 Bayham Drive Plano, TX 75024 / US | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Lawman, Matthew John Mitchell, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London, WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/10] | Lawman, Matthew John Mitchell, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2009/27] | Franks, Adam Peter, et al HP Centre de Compétences IP Section, 5, Av. Raymond Chanas 38053 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2005/37] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell, 138 Hagley Road, Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 03787176.1 | 25.11.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003US37830 | Priority number, date | US20020305175 | 27.11.2002 Original published format: US 305175 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004051412 | Date: | 17.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1573471 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/37] | G06F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VALIDIEREN EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN TRANSAKTION | [2005/37] | English: | VALIDATING AN ELECTRONIC TRANSACTION | [2005/37] | French: | VALIDATION D'UNE TRANSACTION ELECTRONIQUE | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 02.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/47] | 24.05.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/47] | 06.07.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.09.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5557780 (EDWARDS ALLAN T [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * page 1, line 12 - page 4, line 24 * * page 6, line 57 - page 8, line 44 *; | [A]US2002049790 (RICKER JEFFREY M [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 3 - page 2, paragraph 10 ** page 3, paragraph 42 - page 4, paragraph 55 *; | [X]WO02057882 (ECOUTLOOK COM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * page 6, line 24 - page 9, line 8 * * page 11, line 9 - page 12, line 17 * * page 15, line 26 - page 16, line 26 * | International search | [Y]US5704044 (TARTER FRED B [US], et al); | [Y]US5596752 (KNUDSEN HELGE [CA], et al); | [A]US6208973 (BOYER DEAN F [US], et al); | [A]US2002120846 (STEWART WHITNEY HILTON [US], et al); | [A]US5809212 (SHASHA DENNIS [US]) | by applicant | WO02057882 | US5557780 | US2002049790 |