EP1579428 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SELECTIVE DISTRIBUTED SPEECH RECOGNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google Technology Holdings LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2020/02] |
Former [2016/14] | For all designated states Google Technology Holdings LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | ||
Former [2012/35] | For all designated states Motorola Mobility LLC 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | ||
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states Motorola Mobility, Inc. 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | ||
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANASTASAKOS, Tasos 1026 Monica Lane San Jose, CA 95125 / US | 02 /
BALASURIYA, Senaka 1405 Crane Street Arlington Heights, IL 60004 / US | 03 /
VAN WIE, Michael 3650 18th Street No. 2 San Fransisco, CA 94110 / US | [2005/49] |
Former [2005/39] | 01 /
ANASTASAKOS, Tasos 1026 Monica Lane San Jose, CA 95125 / US | ||
02 /
BALASURIYA, Senaka 1405 Crane Street Arlington Heights, IL 60004 / US | |||
03 /
VAN WIE, Michael 24 Portsmouth Terrace 3 Rochester, NY 14607 / US | Representative(s) | Watkin, Timothy Lawrence Harvey, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0QL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/02] | Watkin, Timothy Lawrence Harvey, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House The Oxford Science Park Heatley Road Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | ||
Former [2014/32] | Schley, Jan Malte, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. HighLight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Str. 8 80807 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2005/39] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 03787191.0 | 24.11.2003 | [2005/39] | WO2003US37898 | Priority number, date | US20020334030 | 30.12.2002 Original published format: US 334030 | [2005/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004061819 | Date: | 22.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1579428 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1579428 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/30, G10L15/22 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
G10L15/30 (EP,US);
G10L2015/228 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/51] | G10L11/00 | ||
Former IPC [2005/39] | G10L21/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2020/02] |
Former [2006/16] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2005/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR SELEKTIVE VERTEILTE SPRACHERKENNUNG | [2005/39] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SELECTIVE DISTRIBUTED SPEECH RECOGNITION | [2005/39] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DESTINES A LA RECONNAISSANCE VOCALE SELECTIVE REPARTIE | [2005/39] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/39] | 23.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.04.2019 | 04.04.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.11.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 12.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/51] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 15.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.05.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 08.01.2020 | [2021/10] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO0023985 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-4,7-10,13 * page 3, line 17 - page 5, line 7 * * page 6, line 8 - page 7, line 29; figures 1a,1b,2 * * page 26, line 4 - line 8 * [Y] 5,6,11,12; | [A]US6119087 (KUHN THOMAS MURRAY [US], et al) [A] 1-13* column 3, line 63 - column 4, line L; figure 4 *; | [PX]US2003046074 (RUBACK HARVEY M [US], et al) [PX] 1-13 * abstract *; | [Y] - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS)", ETSI STANDARDS, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, SOPHIA-ANTIPO, FR, (200209), vol. 3-SA1, no. V600, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014027156 [Y] 5,6,11,12 * Section "6 Speech recognition technology" on pages 10-12; page 22, lines 6-12 * | International search | [A]US2001047262 (KURGANOV ALEXANDER [US], et al); | [A]US2001056350 (CALDERONE THEODORE [US], et al); | [X]US2003046074 (RUBACK HARVEY M [US], et al); | [AP]US6615172 (BENNETT IAN M [US], et al); | [AP]US6633846 (BENNETT IAN M [US], et al) |