EP1540196 - CONTROL DEVICE FOR A MODULE FORMING A LOCK MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Sécurité Habitacle Service Propriété Industrielle, 42 rue Le Corbusier, Europarc 94042 Créteil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Valeo Sécurité Habitacle Service Propriété Industrielle, 42 rue Le Corbusier, Europarc 94042 Créteil Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Robert, Johann 32 Rue du But Hameau du BUS 76750 Ernemont sur Buchy / FR | [2005/24] | Application number, filing date | 03787812.1 | 06.08.2003 | WO2003EP50364 | Priority number, date | FR20020010150 | 09.08.2002 Original published format: FR 0210150 | [2005/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004016958 | Date: | 26.02.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1540196 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16C1/26 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
F16C1/262 (EP,US);
E05B79/22 (KR);
E05B85/20 (KR);
F16C1/26 (KR);
Y10T292/1082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] |
Former [N/P] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN EINEN SCHLIESSMECHANISMUS BILDENDES MODUL | [2005/24] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE FOR A MODULE FORMING A LOCK MECHANISM | [2005/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D UN MODULE FORMANT MECANISME DE SERRURE | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 28.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/49] | 14.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2526504 (DBA [FR]); | [A]US4841805 (ITALIANO ANTHONY J [US]); | [A]FR2730772 (VALEO THERMIQUE HABITACLE [FR]); | [A]US6178845 (GUTSCHNER ANDREAS [DE]) |