EP1530790 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECORDING MARKS IN A PHASE-CHANGE TYPE INFORMATION LAYER OF A RECORD CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/20] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEINDERS, Erwin, R. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
HELLMIG, Joachim, W. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2005/20] | Representative(s) | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/20] | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 03787952.5 | 31.07.2003 | WO2003IB03400 | Priority number, date | EP20020078354 | 14.08.2002 Original published format: EP 02078354 | [2005/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004017308 | Date: | 26.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1530790 | Date: | 18.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/0045, G11B7/125 | [2005/20] | CPC: |
G11B7/126 (EP,US);
G11B7/0045 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/1263 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/20] |
Former [N/P] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFZEICHNEN VON MARKIERUNGEN IN EINER INFORMATIONSSCHICHT DES PHASENÄNDERUNGSTYPS EINES AUFZEICHNUNGSTRÄGERS | [2005/20] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECORDING MARKS IN A PHASE-CHANGE TYPE INFORMATION LAYER OF A RECORD CARRIER | [2005/20] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'ENREGISTREMENT DE MARQUES DANS UNE COUCHE D'INFORMATIONS DE TYPE A CHANGEMENT DE PHASE D'UN SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2005/20] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/20] | 02.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/30] | 09.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5848043 (TAKADA KEN ICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,8 * abstract * * column 6, line 31 - line 33; figure 5B *; | [DA]US5732062 (YOKOI KENYA [JP], et al) [DA] 1,2,8,9 * abstract *; | [A]WO0186643 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1,2,8,9 * abstract * * page 6, line 25 - page 7, line 20; figure 2 *; | [A]JP2000268367 (LG ELECTRONICS INC) [A] 5-7,10 * figure 9 *; | US6628594 [ ] (PARK SANG ON [KR]) [ ] * paragraph [0048]; figure 9 *; | [A]US5321682 (SPRUIT JOHANNES HENDRIKUS M [NL], et al) [A] 5-7,10 * abstract * * column 6, line 41 - line 49; figure 6 * |