EP1529146 - SYSTEM AND RELATED METHODS FOR SENSING FORCES ON A MOVABLE BARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WAYNE-DALTON CORP. One Door Drive, P.O. Box 67 Mt. Hope, OH 44667 / US | [2006/52] |
Former [2005/19] | For all designated states WAYNE-DALTON CORP. One Door Drive, P.O. Box 67 Mt. Hope, OH 44660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURRAY, James, S. 5809 Loring Drive Milton, FL 23583 / US | 02 /
BENNETT, Thomas, B., III 3069 Briarwood Drive Wooster, OH 44691 / US | [2005/19] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/19] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 03788265.1 | 25.07.2003 | WO2003US23095 | Priority number, date | US20020222743 | 16.08.2002 Original published format: US 222743 | [2005/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004016895 | Date: | 26.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1529146 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1529146 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/00, E05F15/16 | [2005/19] | CPC: |
E05F15/41 (EP,US);
E05F15/668 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/326 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/554 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/106 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/19] |
Former [N/P] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERFASSUNG DER KRÄFTE AUF EINEM BEWEGLICHEN VERSCHLUSS | [2005/19] | English: | SYSTEM AND RELATED METHODS FOR SENSING FORCES ON A MOVABLE BARRIER | [2005/19] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDES ASSOCIES DE DETECTION DE FORCES SUR UNE BARRIERE AMOVIBLE | [2005/19] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/19] | 31.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.05.2007 | BE | 02.05.2007 | CH | 02.05.2007 | CY | 02.05.2007 | CZ | 02.05.2007 | DK | 02.05.2007 | EE | 02.05.2007 | FI | 02.05.2007 | FR | 02.05.2007 | IT | 02.05.2007 | LI | 02.05.2007 | NL | 02.05.2007 | RO | 02.05.2007 | SI | 02.05.2007 | SK | 02.05.2007 | TR | 02.05.2007 | IE | 25.07.2007 | LU | 25.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | BG | 02.08.2007 | SE | 02.08.2007 | GR | 03.08.2007 | DE | 06.08.2007 | ES | 13.08.2007 | PT | 02.10.2007 | HU | 03.11.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/40] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
CY | 02.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
EE | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
FR | 02.05.2007 | ||
IT | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
RO | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
LU | 25.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
DE | 06.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
CY | 02.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
EE | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
FR | 02.05.2007 | ||
IT | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
RO | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
DE | 06.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
EE | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
FR | 02.05.2007 | ||
IT | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
RO | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
DE | 06.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
FR | 02.05.2007 | ||
IT | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
RO | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
DE | 06.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
IT | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
RO | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
IE | 25.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
DE | 06.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
FR | 28.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
IT | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
RO | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
DE | 06.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
FR | 28.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
IT | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
DE | 06.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
FR | 28.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
IT | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
DE | 06.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SK | 02.05.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
DE | 06.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
DE | 06.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
BG | 02.08.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
DE | 06.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CH | 02.05.2007 | |
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 13.08.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5278480 (MURRAY JAMES S [US]) [A] 1-22 * column 4, line 23 - column 8, line 53; figures 1,3; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US5798681 (CHANG NAI-WEN [US]) [A] 1-22* column 1, line 43 - column 5, line 39; figures 1-6; claim 1 *; | [A]US5929580 (MULLET WILLIS J [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * column 6, line 11 - column 14, line 59; figures 1-5 *; | [DA]US6161438 (MULLET WILLIS J [US], et al) [DA] 1-22 * column 5, line 24 - column 9, line 54; figures 1,2; claims 1-5 * |