EP1543463 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INTER ENTERPRISE CONVERSATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Open Invention Network, LLC P.O. Box 357 Pound Ridge NY 10576 / US | [2008/10] |
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states JGR Acquisition, Inc. 1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347 Wilmington, DE 19899 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Qiming 851 W. Remington Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 02 /
HSU, Meichun 12717 Leander Drive Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 03 /
MEHTA, Vinkesh 8906 Splitarrow Drive Austin, TX 78717 / US | [2005/25] | Representative(s) | Mötteli-Mantelli, Novella Da Vinci Partners LLC Rathausgasse 1 9320 Arbon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | Meldrum, David James, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2013/12] | Lewis, Darren John, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2011/34] | Haines, Miles John L.S., et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2005/25] | Leppard, Andrew John D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03788384.0 | 11.08.2003 | WO2003US25124 | Priority number, date | US20020222008 | 15.08.2002 Original published format: US 222008 | [2005/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004017165 | Date: | 26.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1543463 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
G06Q10/103 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q10/06311 (EP,US);
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
H04L51/04 (US);
Y02P90/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/25] |
Former [N/P] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE SCHNITTSTELLE ZWISCHEN BPSS-KONVERSATIONSMANAGEMENT UND LOKALEM UNTERNEHMENSMANAGENEMT | [2005/25] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR INTER ENTERPRISE CONVERSATION | [2005/25] | French: | INTERFACE DYNAMIQUE ENTRE UNE GESTION DE CONVERSATIONS BPSS ET UNE GESTION COMMERCIALE LOCALE | [2005/25] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 23.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/17] | 15.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/17] | 05.12.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - SAYAL M ET AL INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "Integrating workflow management systems with business-to-business interaction standards", PROCEEDINGS 18TH. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DATA ENGINEERING. (ICDE'2002). SAN JOSE, CA, FEB. 26 - MARCH 1, 2002, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DATA ENGINEERING. (ICDE), LOS ALAMITOS, CA : IEEE COMP. SOC, US, (20020226), vol. CONF. 18, ISBN 0-7695-1531-2, pages 287 - 296, XP010588238 [X] 1-10 * abstract * * section "1. Introduction" * * section "2. B2B interaction standards" * * section "3. Basic workflow concepts and HPPM" * * section "4. Proposed solution" * * section "5. Service library" * * section "6. Process templates" * * section "7. Trade partners conversation manager" * * figures 3,7,8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDE.2002.994737 | [X] - JIANXUN LIU ET AL, "An inter-enterprise workflow management system for B2B E-commerce and supply chain: a case study", 2001 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SYSTEMS MAN AND CYBERNETICS. SMC 2001. TUCSON, AZ, OCT. 7 - 10, 2001, IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SYSTEMS, MAN AND CYBERNETICS, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20011007), VOL. 1 OF 5, ISBN 0-7803-7087-2, pages 2921 - 2926, XP010568876 [X] 1-10 * abstract * * section "2. System Architecture" * * figures 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSMC.2001.971954 | [X] - BHASKARAN K ET AL, "An e-business integration & collaboration platform for b2b e-commerce", ADVANCED ISSUES OF E-COMMERCE AND WEB-BASED INFORMATION SYSTEMS, WECWIS 2001, THIRD INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON. JUN 21-22, 2001, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20010621), ISBN 0-7695-1224-0, pages 120 - 122, XP010551096 [X] 1-10 * abstract * * section "6. Business process integration framework" * * figure 2 * | International search | [Y] - NAICK ET AL, "Business-to-Business Integration Using MQSI", IBM CORPORATION, (200012), pages 3 - 40, XP002982321 | by applicant | - SAYAL M ET AL., "Integrating workflow management systems with business -to- business interaction standards", PROCEEDINGS 18TH. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DATA ENGINEERING. (ICDE'2002, (20020226), vol. 18, doi:doi:10.1109/ICDE.2002.994737, pages 287 - 296, XP010588238 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDE.2002.994737 | - JIANXUN LIU ET AL., "An inter-enterprise workflow management system for B2B E-commerce and supply chain: a case study", 2001 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SYSTEMS MAN AND CYBERNETICS. SMC 2001. TUCSON, (20011007), vol. 1,5, doi:doi:10.1109/ICSMC.2001.971954, pages 2921 - 2926, XP010568876 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSMC.2001.971954 | - BHASKARAN K ET AL., "An e-business integration and collaboration platform for B2B e-commerce", ADVANCED ISSUES OF E-COMMERCE AND WEB-BASED INFORMATION SYSTEMS, WECWIS 2001, THIRD INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP, (20010621), pages 120 - 122, XP010551096 |