EP1551886 - FLUORINATED POLYMERS USEFUL AS PHOTORESISTS, AND PROCESSES FOR MICROLITHOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEIRING, Andrew, Edward 7 Buckridge Drive Wilmington, DE 19807 / US | 02 /
SCHADT, Frank, L., III 2407 Delaware Avenue Wilmington, DE 19806 / US | 03 /
FARNHAM, William, Brown 123 Dewberry Drive Hockessin, DE 19707 / US | 04 /
FELDMAN, Jerald 4403 Channing Road Wilmington, DE 19802 / US | [2005/28] | Representative(s) | Towler, Philip Dean Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Towler, Philip Dean Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2005/28] | Towler, Philip Dean Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03788676.9 | 19.08.2003 | WO2003US26088 | Priority number, date | US20020404374P | 19.08.2002 Original published format: US 404374 P | [2005/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004016664 | Date: | 26.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1551886 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1551886 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.02.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/73 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
C08F232/00 (EP,US);
C08F14/18 (KR);
C08F214/18 (EP,US);
C08F214/26 (EP,US);
C08F220/24 (EP,US);
C08F220/26 (EP,US);
C08F232/08 (EP,US);
C08F8/12 (EP,US);
G03F7/0046 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F8/12, C08F232/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/28] | C08F14/18, G03C1/73 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/28] |
Former [N/P] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUORIERTE POLYMERE, DIE ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS PHOTORESISTS GEEIGNET SIND, UND MIKROLITHOGRAPHIEVERFAHREN | [2005/28] | English: | FLUORINATED POLYMERS USEFUL AS PHOTORESISTS, AND PROCESSES FOR MICROLITHOGRAPHY | [2005/28] | French: | Polymères fluorés utiles en tant que résines photorésistantes, et procédés de microlithographie | [2008/14] |
Former [2005/28] | POLYMERES FLUORES UTILES EN TANT QUE PHOTORESINES, ET PROCEDES DE MICROLITHOGRAPHIE | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 10.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 26.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.09.2008 | BE | 10.09.2008 | CY | 10.09.2008 | CZ | 10.09.2008 | DK | 10.09.2008 | EE | 10.09.2008 | FI | 10.09.2008 | IT | 10.09.2008 | NL | 10.09.2008 | RO | 10.09.2008 | SI | 10.09.2008 | SK | 10.09.2008 | TR | 10.09.2008 | BG | 10.12.2008 | SE | 10.12.2008 | GR | 11.12.2008 | ES | 21.12.2008 | PT | 10.02.2009 | HU | 11.03.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
GR | 11.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
HU | 11.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
GR | 11.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6387589 (KOH CHA WON [KR], et al) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [PA]WO02093263 (CLARIANT INT LTD [CH], et al) [PA] 1-28 * page 8, lines 1,2; claims 1,11 ** page 4, lines 1-7 * | International search | [X]US5229473 (KOBO MOTONOBU [JP], et al); | [YP]US6593058 (FEIRING ANDREW EDWARD [US], et al) |