EP1567829 - NAVIGATION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A NAVIGATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAHLWEG, Cornelius Alter Zollweg 101a 22147 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
KERSKEN, Ulrich Schwarze Heide 13 31199 Diekholzen / DE | [2005/35] | Application number, filing date | 03788813.8 | 22.11.2003 | [2005/35] | WO2003DE03878 | Priority number, date | DE2002155329 | 27.11.2002 Original published format: DE 10255329 | [2005/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004048894 | Date: | 10.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1567829 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1567829 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/26 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
G01C21/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CZ, DE, FR, GB, HU, IT [2006/12] |
Former [2005/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NAVIGATIONSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES NAVIGATIONSSYSTEMS | [2005/35] | English: | NAVIGATION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A NAVIGATION SYSTEM | [2005/35] | French: | SYSTEME DE NAVIGATION ET PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN SYSTEME DE NAVIGATION | [2005/35] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 22.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/41] | IT | 28.06.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1092952 (MANNESMANN VDO AG [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0014]; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0798539 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 13, line 5 - line 18 * * column 14, line 51 - column 15, line 9 *; | [A]JPH037983 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910322), vol. 015, no. 119, Database accession no. (P - 1183), & JP03007983 A 19910116 (ALPINE ELECTRON INC) [A] 1 * abstract * |