EP1549713 - SYNERGISTIC UV ABSORBER COMBINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | [2005/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAIG, Adalbert Baselstrasse 20 79589 Binzen / DE | 02 /
LEPPARD, David, George Route de Bourguillon 6A CH-1723 Marly / CH | 03 /
WENDEBORN, Frédérique 59 Grand Rue F-68220 Ranspach-Le-Haut / FR | [2005/27] | Application number, filing date | 03788915.1 | 23.09.2003 | [2005/27] | WO2003EP10567 | Priority number, date | EP20020405852 | 02.10.2002 Original published format: EP 02405852 | [2005/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004031294 | Date: | 15.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1549713 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1549713 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/16, C08L23/12, C08L33/12, C08K5/34, C08K5/00, C07D263/14, C07D413/10, C08K5/353, C08K5/3462, G03C7/392, C08K5/3492, G03C1/815, C08K5/20 | [2005/27] | CPC: |
A61Q17/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/005 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/435 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/4966 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/18 (EP,KR,US);
D06M13/127 (EP,KR,US);
D06M13/352 (EP,KR,US);
D06M13/358 (EP,KR,US);
D06M2101/20 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYNERGISTISCHE UV-ABSORBER-KOMBINATION | [2005/27] | English: | SYNERGISTIC UV ABSORBER COMBINATION | [2005/27] | French: | COMBINAISON SYNERGISTIQUE D'ABSORBEURS D'UV | [2005/27] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 15.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2006 | CH | 26.07.2006 | CY | 26.07.2006 | CZ | 26.07.2006 | EE | 26.07.2006 | FI | 26.07.2006 | LI | 26.07.2006 | RO | 26.07.2006 | SI | 26.07.2006 | SK | 26.07.2006 | TR | 26.07.2006 | LU | 23.09.2006 | IE | 25.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | BG | 26.10.2006 | DK | 26.10.2006 | GR | 27.10.2006 | ES | 06.11.2006 | PT | 26.12.2006 | HU | 27.01.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
EE | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
TR | 26.07.2006 | ||
LU | 23.09.2006 | ||
IE | 25.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
HU | 27.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
EE | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 25.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
HU | 27.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
EE | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 25.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 25.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 25.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 25.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 26.07.2006 | |
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | CH | 26.07.2006 | |
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | SI | 26.07.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5597854 (BIRBAUM JEAN-LUC [JP], et al) [X] 1-17 * column 1, line 57 - column 5, line 32 ** abstract *; | [X]EP0816346 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1-17 * page 2, line 16 - page 5, line 37 * * abstract *; | [X]US6297300 (VAN NUFFEL CLAUDE T E [BE]) [X] 1-17 * column 2, line 30 - column 7, line 32 * * abstract *; | [X]US2001039304 (GUGUMUS FRANCOIS [CH]) [X] 1-17 * page 1, paragraph 5 - page 4, paragraph 77 * * abstract *; | [X]WO0190244 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [X] 1-17 * page 3, line 16 - page 9, line 24 * * abstract *; | [X]WO0217873 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-17 * page 2, line 15 - page 6, line 20 * * abstract *; | [X]WO02062890 (CYRO IND [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * page 2, line 5 - page 6, line 19 * * abstract *; | [PX]WO03057772 (CYTEC TECH CORP [US]) [PX] 1-17 * page 2, line 3 - page 3, line 19 * * abstract * |