EP1554507 - DRIVE BELT WITH TRANSVERSE ELEMENTS AND STAMPING DEVICE FOR PRODUCING TRANSVERSE ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Van Doorne's Transmissie B.V. Patent Department (AE-CT/EL-P), Postbus 500 5000 AM Tilburg / NL | [2006/16] |
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states Van Doorne's Transmissie B.V. Patent Department (AE-CT/EL-P), Postbus 500 5000 AM Tilburg / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LITH, Johannes, Hendrikus Nijesteijn 29 NL-5258 PL Berlicum / NL | 02 /
LIEMPD, Jeroen, Herman Driehoek 38 NL-4854 RM Bavel / NL | 03 /
PRINSEN, Lucas, Hendricus, Robertus, Maria Bergstraat 9 NL-5175 AC Loon Op Zand / NL | [2005/29] | Application number, filing date | 03788932.6 | 03.10.2003 | [2005/29] | WO2003EP10938 | Priority number, date | NL20021021661 | 16.10.2002 Original published format: NL 1021661 | [2005/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004036083 | Date: | 29.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1554507 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1554507 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16G5/16 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
B21D53/14 (EP,KR);
F16G1/26 (KR);
F16G5/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/29] | Title | German: | TREIBRIEMEN MIT QUERELEMENTEN UND STANZVORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN VON QUERELEMENTEN | [2005/29] | English: | DRIVE BELT WITH TRANSVERSE ELEMENTS AND STAMPING DEVICE FOR PRODUCING TRANSVERSE ELEMENTS | [2005/29] | French: | COURROIE D'ENTRAINEMENT A ELEMENTS TRANSVERSAUX ET DISPOSITIF D'ESTAMPAGE POUR PRODUIRE DES ELEMENTS TRANSVERSAUX | [2005/29] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 12.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.04.2006 | CH | 19.04.2006 | CY | 19.04.2006 | CZ | 19.04.2006 | EE | 19.04.2006 | FI | 19.04.2006 | IT | 19.04.2006 | LI | 19.04.2006 | RO | 19.04.2006 | SI | 19.04.2006 | SK | 19.04.2006 | TR | 19.04.2006 | BG | 19.07.2006 | DK | 19.07.2006 | SE | 19.07.2006 | GR | 20.07.2006 | ES | 30.07.2006 | PT | 19.09.2006 | IE | 03.10.2006 | LU | 03.10.2006 | HU | 20.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
CH | 19.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2006 | ||
EE | 19.04.2006 | ||
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
IT | 19.04.2006 | ||
LI | 19.04.2006 | ||
RO | 19.04.2006 | ||
SI | 19.04.2006 | ||
SK | 19.04.2006 | ||
TR | 19.04.2006 | ||
BG | 19.07.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
GR | 20.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
IE | 03.10.2006 | ||
LU | 03.10.2006 | ||
HU | 20.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
CH | 19.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2006 | ||
EE | 19.04.2006 | ||
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
IT | 19.04.2006 | ||
LI | 19.04.2006 | ||
RO | 19.04.2006 | ||
SI | 19.04.2006 | ||
SK | 19.04.2006 | ||
BG | 19.07.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
GR | 20.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
IE | 03.10.2006 | ||
HU | 20.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
CH | 19.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2006 | ||
EE | 19.04.2006 | ||
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
IT | 19.04.2006 | ||
LI | 19.04.2006 | ||
RO | 19.04.2006 | ||
SI | 19.04.2006 | ||
SK | 19.04.2006 | ||
BG | 19.07.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
GR | 20.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
IE | 03.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
CH | 19.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2006 | ||
EE | 19.04.2006 | ||
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
IT | 19.04.2006 | ||
LI | 19.04.2006 | ||
RO | 19.04.2006 | ||
SI | 19.04.2006 | ||
SK | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
GR | 20.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
IE | 03.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
CH | 19.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2006 | ||
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
IT | 19.04.2006 | ||
LI | 19.04.2006 | ||
RO | 19.04.2006 | ||
SI | 19.04.2006 | ||
SK | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
GR | 20.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
IE | 03.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
CH | 19.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2006 | ||
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
IT | 19.04.2006 | ||
LI | 19.04.2006 | ||
RO | 19.04.2006 | ||
SI | 19.04.2006 | ||
SK | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
IE | 03.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
CH | 19.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2006 | ||
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
IT | 19.04.2006 | ||
LI | 19.04.2006 | ||
RO | 19.04.2006 | ||
SI | 19.04.2006 | ||
SK | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
CH | 19.04.2006 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2006 | ||
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
LI | 19.04.2006 | ||
SI | 19.04.2006 | ||
SK | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
CH | 19.04.2006 | ||
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
LI | 19.04.2006 | ||
SI | 19.04.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | AT | 19.04.2006 | |
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
SI | 19.04.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SI | 19.04.2006 | |
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SI | 19.04.2006 | |
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | SI | 19.04.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2002213539 ; | [D]JPS63115937 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD); | [X]EP0278545 (DOORNES TRANSMISSIE BV [NL]) [X] 1,4,6,10-12,16 * column 7, line 9 - line 38 * * column 8, line 24 - line 33; figures 9,14,25; claim 1 *; | [A]US4826473 (MIYAWAKI MOTOHISA [JP]) [A] 1,11,12 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP1061285 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1,3 * column 6, line 3 - line 13; figures 3,4 *; | [A]EP1069341 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3,10-12 * column 6, line 4 - line 44; figures 1-4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20021106), vol. 2002, no. 11, & JP2002213539 A 20020731 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,10-12,15 * abstract * | by applicant | JPS61260206 | EP1061285 |