EP1563086 - DEVICE FOR DETERMINING THE ACTIVITY OF ENZYMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2005/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TREBBE, Uwe Hollenbeckerstrasse 11 48143 Münster / DE | 02 /
KÖHLING, Nico Goebenstrasse 45 48151 Münster / DE | 03 /
GLÄSEL, Uwe Horstmarer Landweg 82 48149 Münster / DE | 04 /
HÜPPMEYER, Frank Glabonzer Weg 16 48431 Rheine / DE | 05 /
WEISS, Tilo Johannes-Hesse-Strasse 35 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | 06 /
FRANK, Michael Bublitzer Strasse 9 40599 Düsseldorf / DE | [2005/33] | Application number, filing date | 03789039.9 | 14.11.2003 | [2005/33] | WO2003EP12718 | Priority number, date | DE2002154703 | 23.11.2002 Original published format: DE 10254703 | [2005/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004048602 | Date: | 10.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1563086 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/00 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
C12Q1/001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/33] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER AKTIVITÄT VON ENZYMEN | [2005/33] | English: | DEVICE FOR DETERMINING THE ACTIVITY OF ENZYMES | [2005/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR DETERMINER L'ACTIVITE D'ENZYMES | [2005/33] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 28.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/10] | 17.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4072576 (ARWIN HANS RUNE ET AL) [Y] 1-9 * Ansprüche1 - 16; Spalten 3 und 4 überbrückender Paragraph *; | [Y] - SAUM A G E ET AL, "Use of substrate coated electrodes and AC impedance spectroscopy for the detection of enzyme activity", BIOSENS. BIOELECTRON. (UK), BIOSENSORS & BIOELECTRONICS, 15 MARCH 1998, ELSEVIER, UK, (1998), vol. 13, no. 5, ISSN 0956-5663, pages 511 - 518, XP000964692 [Y] 1-9 * Kapitel überschrieben "Introduction" und "Detection of enzymic activity"; siehe insbesondere Seite 512, linke Spalte, Paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0956-5663(97)00129-2 | [Y] - TEXTOR M ET AL, "Molecular assembly of multifunctional molecules at metal oxides surfaces to design 2D and 3D biointerfaces", 2002, LUND, SWEDEN, LUND UNIV, SWEDEN, page 2 pp., URL: http://www.textorgroup.ch/pdf/talksposters/talks/21/Abstract_nano7_textor.pdf, XP002277506 [Y] 1-9 * das gesamte Dokument * | [Y] - CHAKI N K ET AL, "Self-assembled monolayers as a tunable platform for biosensor applications", BIOSENS. BIOELECTRON. (UK), BIOSENSORS & BIOELECTRONICS, JAN. 2002, ELSEVIER, UK, (2002), vol. 17, no. 1-2, ISSN 0956-5663, pages 1 - 12, XP002277507 [Y] 1-9 * das gesamte Dokument; insbesondere Abschnitte 2, 4.2, 5 und 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0956-5663(01)00277-9 | [A] - SAUM A G E ET AL, "Detection of protease activity in the wetted surface of gelatin-coated electrodes in air by AC impedance spectroscopy", BIOSENS. BIOELECTRON. (UK), BIOSENSORS & BIOELECTRONICS, AUG. 2000, ELSEVIER, UK, (2000), vol. 15, no. 5-6, ISSN 0956-5663, pages 305 - 313, XP002277508 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0956-5663(00)00068-3 |