EP1571958 - WIPING DEVICE COMPRISING A DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2005/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAMRATH, Joachim Raiffeisenstr. 7 89429 Bachhagel / DE | 02 /
SPIELMANNLEITNER, Markus Rosenberger Str. 49 73479 Ellwangen / DE | 03 /
WETZL, Gerhard Hohweierstr. 15 89567 Sontheim / DE | [2005/37] | Application number, filing date | 03789058.9 | 19.11.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003EP12964 | Priority number, date | DE2002156090 | 02.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10256090 | [2005/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004050265 | Date: | 17.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1571958 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1571958 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A47L11/284 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
A47L11/4066 (EP,US);
A47L11/28 (EP,US);
A47L11/4011 (EP,US);
A47L11/4069 (EP,US);
A47L13/256 (EP,US);
A47L13/48 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Title | German: | WISCHVORRICHTUNG MIT ANTRIEB | [2005/37] | English: | WIPING DEVICE COMPRISING A DRIVE | [2005/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE PAR FROTTEMENT COMPORTANT UN ORGANE D'ENTRAINEMENT | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 25.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.03.2009 | CZ | 11.03.2009 | DK | 11.03.2009 | EE | 11.03.2009 | FI | 11.03.2009 | IE | 11.03.2009 | NL | 11.03.2009 | RO | 11.03.2009 | SI | 11.03.2009 | SK | 11.03.2009 | TR | 11.03.2009 | BG | 11.06.2009 | SE | 11.06.2009 | GR | 12.06.2009 | ES | 22.06.2009 | PT | 24.08.2009 | HU | 12.09.2009 | AT | 19.11.2009 | LU | 19.11.2009 | BE | 30.11.2009 | CH | 30.11.2009 | LI | 30.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/31] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
HU | 12.09.2009 | ||
AT | 19.11.2009 | ||
LU | 19.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
AT | 19.11.2009 | ||
LU | 19.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/08] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
AT | 19.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | CZ | 11.03.2009 | |
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | FI | 11.03.2009 | |
IE | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | FI | 11.03.2009 | |
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | FI | 11.03.2009 | |
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | FI | 11.03.2009 | |
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | NL | 11.03.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3416177 (YOUNG VERA E); | [X]US5381578 (ARMBRUSTER JOSEPH M [US]) [X] 1-4,6,8,10,11,13 * column 2, line 25 - column 2, line 36; figure 10 *; | [X]DE29712122U (WEIDIG WILFRIED [DE]) [X] 1-4,8,10,11,13 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0182766 (PERSONAL ROBOTICS INC [US]) [X] 1-5,8,13 * page 2, line 10 - page 3, line 15; figures 1-4 *; | [X]WO0239864 (AASEN TORBJOERN [NO]) [X] 1-4,11,13 * the whole document * |