EP1636518 - ELECTROMAGNETIC VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | [2006/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOSS, Christoph Schäfflestrasse 13 60386 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2006/12] | Application number, filing date | 03789180.1 | 09.12.2003 | [2006/12] | WO2003EP13935 | Priority number, date | DE2002158268 | 13.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10258268 | DE2003123656 | 26.05.2003 Original published format: DE 10323656 | DE2003143841 | 23.09.2003 Original published format: DE 10343841 | [2006/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004055420 | Date: | 01.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1636518 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16K1/00 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
B60T8/3675 (EP,US);
B60T8/363 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/14] |
Former [2006/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROMAGNETVENTIL | [2006/12] | English: | ELECTROMAGNETIC VALVE | [2006/12] | French: | SOUPAPE ELECTROMAGNETIQUE | [2006/12] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19739886 (ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US]) [X] 1-4,8 * column 1, line 51 - column 4, line 56; figure 4 *; | [A]US5984263 (HOSOYA YUKIO [JP]) [A] 1,9,10 * figures 3,4 *; | [X]DE19936711 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1,11-16 * column 2, line 6 - column 7, line 27; figure 2D *; | [X]DE10030250 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 43 - column 4, line 29; figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE10010734 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1,11-16 * column 1, line 48 - column 3, line 50; figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE10064169 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 44 - column 4, line 46; figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE10047399 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1,4-7,9 * column 1, line 56 - column 5, line 33; figure 1 *; | [X]DE10141134 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1* column 1, line 42 - column 3, line 46; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE19928748 |