EP1573882 - LITZ WIRE COILS FOR ELECTRIC MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2007 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLBRICH, Irene Brunsbütteler Damm 17 13581 Berlin / DE | 02 /
RISSE, Joachim Klausingring 13 13627 Berlin / DE | 03 /
SCHÄFER, Klaus Finkenschlag 22a 90455 Nürnberg / DE | [2005/37] | Application number, filing date | 03789249.4 | 12.12.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003EP14145 | Priority number, date | DE2002160317 | 20.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10260317 | [2005/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004059817 | Date: | 15.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1573882 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1573882 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02K3/14 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
H02K3/34 (EP,US);
H02K15/12 (EP,US);
H02K3/04 (EP,US);
H02K3/30 (EP,US);
H02K2203/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/15] |
Former [2005/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPULEN FÜR ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINEN IN LITZENTECHNIK | [2005/37] | English: | LITZ WIRE COILS FOR ELECTRIC MACHINES | [2005/37] | French: | BOBINES POUR MOTEURS ELECTRIQUES REALISEES SELON LA TECHNIQUE DES CONDUCTEURS MULTIBRINS | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 26.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 19.04.2006 | [2007/41] | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0060721 (ALSTOM UK LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,8,9,12 * page 8, line 27 - page 15, line 27; figures 1,2,4 *; | [XY]US4260924 (LUGOSI ROBERT, et al) [X] 1-3,8,9 * column 1, line 5 - line 20 * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 2; figures 4,6,7 * [Y] 5-7,10,11; | [Y]DE3133811 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 5-7,10,11 * page 2, line 33 - page 6, line 10 *; | [A]EP0810249 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 7,10,11 * page 2, line 5 - page 3, line 50 * |