EP1578834 - POLYURETHANE REACTIVE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2015 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2011/16] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. Washington Street, 1790 Building Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROHRER, Paul Feldstrasse 50 CH-8704 Herrliberg / CH | 02 /
SCHNEIDER, Daniel Stoffelstrasse 2 CH-8804 Au / CH | 03 /
SYMIETZ, Detlef Leuholz 5 CH-8855 Wangen / CH | [2005/39] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG, et al Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2015/08] | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG, et al Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2005/39] | Menzl, Anna, et al Patentanwälte Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 03789274.2 | 13.12.2003 | [2005/39] | WO2003EP14221 | Priority number, date | EP20020406134 | 23.12.2002 Original published format: EP 02406134 | [2005/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004056903 | Date: | 08.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1578834 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1578834 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/79, C08G18/80, C08G18/42, C08G18/22, C08G18/70, C09J175/06 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
C08G18/088 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/79 (KR);
C08G18/0885 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/0895 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/10 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/16 (KR);
C08G18/222 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/227 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/244 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/4018 (EP,US);
C08G18/42 (KR);
C08G18/4238 (EP,US);
C08G18/4277 (EP,US);
C08G18/44 (EP,US);
C08G18/5024 (EP,US);
C08G18/755 (EP,US);
C08G18/7621 (EP,US);
C08G18/798 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/42 (US,EP);
C08G18/10, C08G18/755 (US,EP);
C08G18/10, C08G18/798 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REAKTIVE POLYURETHANZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2005/39] | English: | POLYURETHANE REACTIVE COMPOSITION | [2005/39] | French: | COMPOSITION REACTIVE DE POLYURETHANNE | [2005/39] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/39] | 05.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP05022195.1 / EP1632515 | EP06004469.0 / EP1671996 | EP07019524.3 / EP1876197 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 22.11.2005 | Stay of proceedings | [2006/03] | 22.11.2005 | Stay of proceedings | [2007/37] | 03.09.2007 | Resumption of proceedings | [2007/37] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.12.2003 | AT | 18.02.2015 | BE | 18.02.2015 | BG | 18.02.2015 | CY | 18.02.2015 | CZ | 18.02.2015 | DK | 18.02.2015 | EE | 18.02.2015 | ES | 18.02.2015 | FI | 18.02.2015 | IT | 18.02.2015 | MC | 18.02.2015 | NL | 18.02.2015 | PT | 18.02.2015 | RO | 18.02.2015 | SE | 18.02.2015 | SI | 18.02.2015 | SK | 18.02.2015 | TR | 18.02.2015 | GR | 19.05.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 13.12.2003 | |
AT | 18.02.2015 | ||
BE | 18.02.2015 | ||
BG | 18.02.2015 | ||
CY | 18.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
ES | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
TR | 18.02.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
BE | 18.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
ES | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
BE | 18.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
ES | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
ES | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
ES | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
ES | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
ES | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
ES | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 18.02.2015 | |
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 18.02.2015 | |
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 18.02.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4788083 (DAMMANN LAURENCE G [US], et al) [X] 1,5-7,15-20* table 31 *; | [X]WO9600754 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1,5-7,15-20 * examples 6,7 *; | [X]US5574123 (BOCK MANFRED [DE], et al) [X] 1-26 * example 5 *; | [X]EP0761705 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,5-7,15-20 * examples 7,12 *; | [X]US6258918 (HO CHIA-TIE [US], et al) [X] 1,5-7,15-20 * table 4 * |