EP1580431 - ELECTRIC INTERNAL GEAR PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2009 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | ||
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-0081 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKATA, Takatoshi 1-1-308, Isono-cho Yamatotakada-shi, Nara 635-0093 / JP | 02 /
YUKITAKE, Yasuhiro c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 03 /
ASAI, Yasuo 6-13-10, Kokubuhonmachi Kashiwara-shi, Osaka 582-0021 / JP | [2009/04] |
Former [2005/39] | 01 /
SAKATA, Takatoshi 1-1-308, Isono-cho Yamatotakada-shi, Nara 635-0093 / JP | ||
02 /
YUKITAKE, Yasuhiro 1-26-10, Tatsunominami, Sangou-cho Ikoma-gun, Nara 636-0822 / JP | |||
03 /
ASAI, Yasuo 6-13-10, Kokubuhonmachi Kashiwara-shi, Osaka 582-0021 / JP | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | Sajda, Wolf E., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03789622.2 | 22.12.2003 | [2005/39] | WO2003JP16507 | Priority number, date | JP20020371500 | 24.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002371500 | JP20020371501 | 24.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002371501 | [2005/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004061309 | Date: | 22.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1580431 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F04C2/10 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
F04C11/008 (EP,US);
F04C2/102 (EP,US);
F04C2240/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/16] |
Former [2005/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE INNENZAHNRADPUMPE | [2005/39] | English: | ELECTRIC INTERNAL GEAR PUMP | [2005/39] | French: | POMPE A ENGRENAGES INTERNE ELECTRIQUE | [2005/39] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2005 | Translation filed | 17.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 17.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/39] | 19.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5122039 (TUCKEY CHARLES H [US]) [X] 2,3* column 4, line 4 - line 58; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US5219277 (TUCKEY CHARLES H [US]) [X] 2,3 * column 4, line 12 - line 66; figures 1,2 * | International search | [Y]JPS5976778U ; | [A]JPS63126571U ; | [Y]JPH01174584U ; | [X]JPH0481586 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH07145785 (NIPPON DENSO CO) |