EP1586017 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PAY FOR PERFORMANCE ADVERTISING HAVING BIDDABLE ADVERTISING UNITS UTILIZING ROTATING ROUTING TO ADVERTISER WEBSITES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adknowledge, Inc. 4600 Madison Avenue 10th Floor Kansas City, MO 64112 / US | [2012/36] |
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states Miva, Inc. 12751 Suite 3 Westlinks Drive Fort Meyers, FL 33913 / US | ||
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states FINDWHAT.COM 5220 Summerlin Commons Blvd. Suite 500 Fort Meyers, FL 33913 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PISARIS-HENDERSON, Craig, Allen 11710 Rosemount Drive Fort Myers, FL 33913 / US | 02 /
GARCIA, Anthony, Albert 13800 Silver Lake Court Fort Myers, FL 33912 / US | 03 /
THUNE, Phillip, Ross 7885 Go Canes Way Fort Meyers, FL 33912 / US | 04 /
WILLIAMS, Jason, Benhard 2011 SE 13th Street Cape Coral, FL 33990 / US | 05 /
RAE, David, Clouston 209 Egret Avenue Naples, FL 34108 / US | 06 /
NEUMANN, Peter, Thomas 20 Winewood Court Fort Myers, FL 33919 / US | 07 /
HART, Sean, Patrick 13397 Broadhurst Loop Fort Meyers, FL 33919 / US | 08 /
PROTHEROE, Robert, Llewellyn 9660 Wilshire Lakes Boulevard Naples, FL 34109 / US | [2005/42] | Representative(s) | Adler, Peter Lippert, Stachow & Partner Krenkelstrasse 3 01309 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | Adler, Peter Lippert, Stachow & Partner Krenkelstrasse 3 01309 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 03790149.3 | 26.11.2003 | [2005/42] | WO2003US38007 | Priority number, date | US20020429494P | 27.11.2002 Original published format: US 429494 P | [2005/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004051418 | Date: | 17.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1586017 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q30/0255 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0275 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UNDVERFAHREN ZUR BEZAHLUNG FÜR LEISTUNGSWERBUNG MIT BIDFÄHIGEN WERBEEINHEITENUNTER VERWENDUNG EINES ROTIERENDEN ROUTING ZU WERBER-WEBSITES | [2005/42] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PAY FOR PERFORMANCE ADVERTISING HAVING BIDDABLE ADVERTISING UNITS UTILIZING ROTATING ROUTING TO ADVERTISER WEBSITES | [2005/42] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE PUBLICITE AVEC REMUNERATION AU RENDEMENT, PRESENTANT DES UNITES DE PUBLICITE POUVANT FAIRE L'OBJET D'UNE OFFRE, ET UTILISANT UN ACHEMINEMENT PAR ROTATION VERS DES SITES WEB PUBLICITAIRES | [2005/42] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 06.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/42] | 19.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/41] | 15.01.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/41] | 22.05.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.02.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0101217 (COLORSTAMPS INC [US]); | [Y]US2001054001 (ROBINSON GARY B [US]) |