EP1532364 - METHOD FOR WORKING A WORKPIECE FOR A FUEL HIGH-PRESSURE ACCUMULATOR AND WORKPIECE FOR USING THIS METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UMFORMTECHNIK BÄUERLE GMBH Klotzbachstrasse 2 73560 Böbingen/Rems / DE | [2005/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGMANN, Joachim, W. Am Pappelgraben 29 99425 Weimar / DE | 02 /
VIEWEG, Niels Radmüllerweg 31 86391 Stadtbergen / DE | [2005/21] | Representative(s) | Kassner, Klaus Retzdorffpromenade 2/II 12161 Berlin / DE | [2005/21] | Application number, filing date | 03790726.8 | 15.08.2003 | [2005/21] | WO2003DE02760 | Priority number, date | DE2002139379 | 25.08.2002 Original published format: DE 10239379 | [2005/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004020815 | Date: | 11.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1532364 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1532364 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F02M55/02, B23P15/00, B23P9/02 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
B23P9/04 (EP);
B23P15/00 (EP);
C21D8/10 (EP);
F02M55/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEARBEITUNG EINES WERKSTÜCKES FÜR EINEN KRAFTSTOFFHOCHDRUCKSPEICHER UND WERKSTÜCK ZUR ANWENDUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2005/21] | English: | METHOD FOR WORKING A WORKPIECE FOR A FUEL HIGH-PRESSURE ACCUMULATOR AND WORKPIECE FOR USING THIS METHOD | [2005/21] | French: | PROCEDE D'USINAGE D'UNE PIECE DESTINEE A UN ACCUMULATEUR DE CARBURANT HAUTE PRESSION ET PIECE DESTINEE A LA MISE EN OEUVRE DU PROCEDE | [2005/21] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 06.05.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.11.2005 | EE | 23.11.2005 | FI | 23.11.2005 | IE | 23.11.2005 | BG | 23.02.2006 | GR | 23.02.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/28] | EE | 23.11.2005 | |
FI | 23.11.2005 | ||
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
IT | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
BG | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 23.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH10246378 ; | [X]JPH10196869 ; | [A]JP2001280218 ; | [A]GB758912 (ANDRE HUET, et al) [A] 2 * page 1, line 21 - line 32 *; | [XY]US6050611 (ASADA KIKUO [JP]) [X] 6,7 * column 5, line 7 - line 28; figure - * [Y] 1-5; | [A]US2002005186 (ASADA KIKUO [JP], et al) [A] 3 * figures 4,8,10 *; | [DX]DE10056405 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DX] 6,7,9,10 * figures 2,3; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP1226888 (KABUSHIKIGAISHA KOSHINGIKEN [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, & JP10246378 A 19980914 (USUI INTERNATL IND CO LTD) [X] 6-9 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, & JP10196869 A 19980731 (USUI INTERNATL IND CO LTD) [X] 6-9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020402), vol. 2002, no. 02, & JP2001280218 A 20011010 (USUI INTERNATL IND CO LTD) [A] 4,5 * abstract * |