EP1537759 - METHOD FOR COUNTERACTING THE OCCLUSION EFFECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OTICON A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | [2014/30] |
Former [2006/01] | For all designated states OTICON A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smoerum / DK | ||
Former [2005/23] | For all designated states OTICON A/S Strandvejen 58 2900 Hellerup / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RASMUSSEN, Karsten Bo Oticon A/S Strandvejen 58 DK-2900 Hellerup / DK | 02 /
LAUGESEN, Soren Oticon A/S Standvejen 58 DK-2900 Hellerup / DK | [2014/14] |
Former [2005/23] | 01 /
RASMUSSEN, Karsten Bo, Oticon A/S Strandvejen 58 DK-2900 Hellerup / DK | ||
02 /
LAUGESEN, Soren, Oticon A/S Standvejen 58 DK-2900 Hellerup / DK | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Stralauer Platz 34 10243 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40 A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2005/23] | Christensen, Mikael T. C/O Oticon A/S Strandvejen 58 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 03790755.7 | 07.08.2003 | [2005/23] | WO2003DK00528 | Priority number, date | DK20020001292 | 02.09.2002 Original published format: DK 200201292 | [2005/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004021740 | Date: | 11.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1537759 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1537759 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00, // A61F11:08 | [2014/30] | CPC: |
H04R25/505 (EP,US);
A61F11/145 (EP,US);
H04R2460/05 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/23] | H04R25/00, // A61F11:08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/23] | Title | German: | METHODE FÜR DAS ENTGEGENWIRKEN VON OKKLUSIONSEFFEKTEN | [2014/08] | English: | METHOD FOR COUNTERACTING THE OCCLUSION EFFECTS | [2005/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE LUTTE CONTRE LES EFFETS D'OCCLUSION | [2005/23] |
Former [2005/23] | METHODE FÜR DAS ENTGEGENWIRKEN VON AUSSCHLIESSUNGEFFEKTEN | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 19.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2006 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.04.2015
30.04.2015
ADMISSIBLE Sivantos Pte. Ltd. 18 Tai Seng Street No. 08-08 18 Tai Seng Singapore 539775 / SG Opponent's representative FDST Patentanwälte Nordostpark 16 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2018/08] |
Former [2015/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.04.2015
30.04.2015
ADMISSIBLE Sivantos Pte. Ltd. Block 28, Ayer Rajah Crescent, No 06-08 Singapur 139959 / SG Opponent's representative FDST Patentanwälte Nordostpark 16 90411 Nürnberg / DE | 02.06.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.12.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.08.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.09.2017 | 12.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 10.12.2017 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2018/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.08.2003 | AT | 23.07.2014 | BE | 23.07.2014 | CH | 23.07.2014 | CY | 23.07.2014 | CZ | 23.07.2014 | EE | 23.07.2014 | ES | 23.07.2014 | FI | 23.07.2014 | IT | 23.07.2014 | LI | 23.07.2014 | MC | 23.07.2014 | NL | 23.07.2014 | RO | 23.07.2014 | SE | 23.07.2014 | SI | 23.07.2014 | SK | 23.07.2014 | TR | 23.07.2014 | IE | 07.08.2014 | LU | 07.08.2014 | BG | 23.10.2014 | GR | 24.10.2014 | PT | 24.11.2014 | DK | 31.08.2017 | [2018/35] |
Former [2018/21] | HU | 07.08.2003 | |
AT | 23.07.2014 | ||
BE | 23.07.2014 | ||
CH | 23.07.2014 | ||
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LI | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
TR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 07.08.2014 | ||
LU | 07.08.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 07.08.2003 | |
AT | 23.07.2014 | ||
BE | 23.07.2014 | ||
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
TR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 07.08.2014 | ||
LU | 07.08.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 07.08.2003 | |
AT | 23.07.2014 | ||
BE | 23.07.2014 | ||
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 07.08.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 07.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 07.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 23.07.2014 | |
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 23.07.2014 | |
SE | 23.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0217838 (SINTEF TELE OG DATA [NO], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 1, line 1 - page 5, line 16 * * abstract *; | [PX]US2003012391 (ARMSTRONG STEPHEN W [CA], et al) [PX] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5201006 (WEINRICH SOREN [DK]) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5577511 (KILLION MEAD C [US]) [Y] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]EP1154673 (OTICON AS [DK]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US5875254 (HANRIGHT WILLIAM L [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | Examination | EP1251714 |