EP1542936 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING A PREFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nextrom Oy Ensimmäinen savu, PO Box 44 01511 Vantaa / FI | [2006/25] |
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states Nextrom Holding S.A. 15, rue de la Gare 1110 Morges / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HYVÄRINEN, Jouni Ilotulitustie 20 A 10 FIN-00930 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
SOININEN, Pekka Ilmarinkatu 10 B 28 FIN-00100 Helsinki / FI | 03 /
HOVINEN, Anssi Nummikuja 15 FIN-02730 Espoo / FI | 04 /
IHALAINEN, Heikki Iltaruskontie 4 A 4 FIN-02120 Espoo / FI | [2005/25] | Representative(s) | Valkeiskangas, Tapio Lassi Paavali Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Valkeiskangas, Tapio Lassi Paavali Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2005/25] | Valkeiskangas, Tapio Kolster Oy AB, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 03790986.8 | 01.09.2003 | [2005/25] | WO2003FI00637 | Priority number, date | FI20020001564 | 02.09.2002 Original published format: FI 20021564 | [2005/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004020353 | Date: | 11.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1542936 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C03B37/025, C03B23/047 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
C03B23/047 (EP,US);
C03B37/0124 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, LI [2005/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG EINER VORFORM | [2005/25] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING A PREFORM | [2005/25] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE PREFORME | [2005/25] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 22.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 13.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/42] | 29.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.02.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4608071 (YOKOKAWA KIYOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US6438997 (SAITO TATSUHIKO [JP], et al); | [A]US5755849 (HOSHINO SUMIO [JP], et al); | [A]US4121920 (BALKWILL JOHN T); | [A]US4654065 (NAUMANN ROBERT J [US], et al) | Examination | US3753672 | EP0885852 | US5961681 | EP1156018 |