EP1532600 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING TRAFFIC INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Itis Holdings Plc The Warrent House, 1 High Street Altrincham Cheshire WA14 1PZ / GB | [2008/13] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states Itis Holdings Plc The Warrent House, 1 High Street Altrincham, Cheshire WA14 1PZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURR, Jonathan Charles 15 Leicester Road Hale, Altrincham, Cheshire WA15 9QA / GB | 02 /
GATES, Gary 12 Dale Gardens Heswall, Wirral CH60 6TQ / GB | 03 /
SLATER, Alan George 6 Oaklands Hillside, Heaton, Bolton BL1 5DZ / GB | [2005/21] | Representative(s) | Hill, Justin John, et al Ipulse (IP) Ltd. Carrington House 126-130 Regent Street London W1B 5SE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | Hill, Justin John, et al McDermott Will & Emery 7 Bishopsgate London EC2N 3AR / GB | Application number, filing date | 03791018.9 | 27.08.2003 | [2005/21] | WO2003GB03702 | Priority number, date | GB20020020062 | 29.08.2002 Original published format: GB 0220062 | GB20030008188 | 09.04.2003 Original published format: GB 0308188 | [2005/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004021305 | Date: | 11.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1532600 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1532600 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/0968 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
G01C21/3492 (EP,US);
G08G1/0104 (EP,US);
G08G1/096811 (EP,US);
G08G1/096822 (EP,US);
G08G1/096838 (EP,US);
G08G1/096861 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERKEHRSINFORMATIONSBEREITSTELLUNG | [2005/21] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING TRAFFIC INFORMATION | [2005/21] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE MISE A DISPOSITION D'INFORMATION DE TRAFIC | [2005/21] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 28.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08101854.1 / EP1918895 | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.03.2008 | BE | 26.03.2008 | CY | 26.03.2008 | CZ | 26.03.2008 | DK | 26.03.2008 | EE | 26.03.2008 | FI | 26.03.2008 | NL | 26.03.2008 | RO | 26.03.2008 | SI | 26.03.2008 | SK | 26.03.2008 | TR | 26.03.2008 | BG | 26.06.2008 | SE | 26.06.2008 | GR | 27.06.2008 | IE | 27.08.2008 | LU | 27.08.2008 | CH | 31.08.2008 | LI | 31.08.2008 | MC | 31.08.2008 | PT | 01.09.2008 | HU | 27.09.2008 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
TR | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
LU | 27.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
HU | 27.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
LU | 27.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
HU | 27.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
LU | 27.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
IE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
FI | 26.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0372840 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 13,14,16-20,52,53,55-59 * column 8, lines 27-35 * * column 9, lines 14-22 * * column 15, lines 22-26 * * column 16, lines 10-19 * * figure 7b *; | [A]US5182555 (SUMNER ROY L [US]) [A] 32,71 * column 3, lines 54-56 * * column 5, lines 18-20 * * column 10, lines 10-17 ** column 11, lines 46-52 *; | [Y]US5539645 (MANDHYAN INDUR B [US], et al) [Y] 24-27,31,33,34,36,37,63-66,70,72-76 * column 1, lines 27-35 * * column 2, lines 52-57 * * column 4, lines 17-55 * * column 5, lines 33-39 * * column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 7 * * column 8, lines 61-66 *; | [X]WO9740606 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 13,14,16-22,52,53,55-61 * page 6, lines 23-25 * * page 7, lines 5-8 * * page 10, line 7 - page 11, line 27 *; | [X]EP0838663 (NAVIGATION TECH CORP [US]) [X] 13-15,52-54 * page 2, lines 27-31 * * page 3, lines 1-9 * * page 6, line 55 - page 7, line 19 * * page 7, columns 52-54 *; | [XY]EP0936590 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,23,25,31,34,40,62,64,70,73 * column 1, lines 5-6 * * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 2 * * column 3, lines 41-45 * [Y] 24-27,31,33,34,36,37,63-66,70,72-76; | [X]DE19933639 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-5,39-44 * column 2, lines 57-67 * * column 3, lines 31-40 *; | [X]DE10037827 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-9,11,12,39-48,50,51,78-80 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 10 * * column 3, lines 35-39 * * column 4, lines 44-65 * * column 5, lines 1-7 * * figure 2 * |