EP1540862 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING CONTEXT SENSITIVE RECOMMENDATIONS TO DIGITAL SERVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2014/24] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SORVARI, Antti Landbontie 35 FIN-01100 Itäsalmi / FI | 02 /
KÄHÄRI, Markus Metsäpurontie 20 C 21 FIN-00630 Helsinki / FI | 03 /
TOIVONEN, Hannu Kytöpolku 39F FIN-00740 Helsinki / FI | 04 /
MANNILA, Heikki Lintuparvenpuisto 6 FIN-02660 Espoo / FI | 05 /
SALMENKAITA, Jukka-Pekka Kuusitie 15 A 32 FIN-00270 Helsinki / FI | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | ||
Former [2009/39] | Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby Derbyshire DE1 1GY / GB | ||
Former [2005/24] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03791101.3 | 28.08.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003IB03575 | Priority number, date | US20020230111 | 29.08.2002 Original published format: US 230111 | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004021613 | Date: | 11.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1540862 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1540862 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.03.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, H04W4/00 | [2012/45] | CPC: |
H04M3/493 (EP,US);
H04W8/18 (KR);
H04M1/72454 (EP,US);
G06F16/9562 (EP,US);
H04M1/72445 (EP,US);
H04M1/72457 (EP,US);
H04M7/0036 (EP,US);
H04W4/00 (EP,US);
H04M2201/16 (EP,US);
H04M2242/30 (EP,US);
H04M3/2218 (EP,US);
H04M3/42178 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/26] | H04H7/00, H04M3/493, H04M1/72, G06F17/30 | ||
Former IPC [2005/24] | H04H7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG KONTEXTABHÄNGIGER EMPFEHLUNGEN FÜR DIGITALE DIENSTE | [2005/24] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING CONTEXT SENSITIVE RECOMMENDATIONS TO DIGITAL SERVICES | [2005/24] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE FOURNISSANT DES RECOMMANDATIONS CONTEXTUELLES A DES SERVICES NUMERIQUES | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 31.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 20.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2007 | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.08.2003 | AT | 19.03.2014 | BE | 19.03.2014 | CY | 19.03.2014 | CZ | 19.03.2014 | DK | 19.03.2014 | EE | 19.03.2014 | FI | 19.03.2014 | MC | 19.03.2014 | RO | 19.03.2014 | SE | 19.03.2014 | SI | 19.03.2014 | SK | 19.03.2014 | TR | 19.03.2014 | BG | 19.06.2014 | GR | 20.06.2014 | PT | 21.07.2014 | GB | 28.08.2014 | IE | 28.08.2014 | LU | 28.08.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 28.08.2003 | |
AT | 19.03.2014 | ||
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
GB | 28.08.2014 | ||
IE | 28.08.2014 | ||
LU | 28.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
GB | 28.08.2014 | ||
IE | 28.08.2014 | ||
LU | 28.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
GB | 28.08.2014 | ||
IE | 28.08.2014 | ||
LU | 28.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
GB | 28.08.2014 | ||
LU | 28.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
DK | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
BE | 19.03.2014 | ||
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | BE | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | BE | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
FI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0924916 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,7,18-20,23-25,28-30 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0032] *; | [A]WO0067159 (XEROX CORP [US]); | [A]US6182113 (NARAYANASWAMI CHANDRASEKHAR [US]) [A] * abstract *; | [A]EP1130883 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0028] *; | [A]US2002077085 (KALISH DAN [IL], et al) [A] * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0038] * | International search | [Y]US6208839 (DAVANI SHOURESH TONY [US]); | [Y]US6285364 (GIORDANO III JOSEPH [US], et al); | [YP]US6522875 (DOWLING ERIC MORGAN [US], et al); | [YP]US6547830 (MERCER PAUL [US]) | by applicant | WO0067159 | US6182113 | EP1130883 |