EP1533548 - SIDE RAIL FOR COMBINATION OIL RING AND METHOD OF NITRIDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Riken Corporation 13-5, Kundankita 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | [2012/42] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states Riken Corporation 13-5, Kundankita 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INOUE, Shigeo Kashiwazaki Plant 1-37, Hokuto-cho Kashiwazaki-shi, Niigata 945-0027 / JP | [2012/42] |
Former [2005/21] | 01 /
INOUE, Shigeo Kashiwazaki Plant 1-37, Hokuto-cho Kashiwazaki-shi, Niigata 945-0027 / JP | Representative(s) | Strobel, Wolfgang, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Strobel, Wolfgang, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/21] | Strobel, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Kroher . Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03791310.0 | 26.08.2003 | [2005/21] | WO2003JP10800 | Priority number, date | JP20020246567 | 27.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002246567 | [2005/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004020878 | Date: | 11.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1533548 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1533548 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.03.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16J9/26, C23C8/38 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
F16J9/26 (EP,KR,US);
C23C8/38 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/548 (KR);
C23C14/56 (KR);
C23C8/02 (EP,KR,US);
C23C8/26 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/21] | Title | German: | SEITENLEISTE FÜR KOMBINATIONSÖLRING UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN NITRIERUNG | [2005/21] | English: | SIDE RAIL FOR COMBINATION OIL RING AND METHOD OF NITRIDING THE SAME | [2005/21] | French: | RAIL LATERAL POUR ANNEAU D'HUILE DE COMBINAISON ET PROCEDE DE NITRATATION | [2005/21] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2004 | Translation filed | 22.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2004 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 16.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.09.2011 | 06.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.08.2003 | AT | 17.10.2012 | BE | 17.10.2012 | CY | 17.10.2012 | CZ | 17.10.2012 | DK | 17.10.2012 | EE | 17.10.2012 | FI | 17.10.2012 | IT | 17.10.2012 | MC | 17.10.2012 | NL | 17.10.2012 | RO | 17.10.2012 | SE | 17.10.2012 | SI | 17.10.2012 | SK | 17.10.2012 | TR | 17.10.2012 | BG | 17.01.2013 | GR | 18.01.2013 | ES | 28.01.2013 | PT | 18.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
IT | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
TR | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
IT | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
IT | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
RO | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
DK | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 17.10.2012 | |
BE | 17.10.2012 | ||
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 17.10.2012 | |
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
PT | 18.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | BE | 17.10.2012 | |
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 17.10.2012 | |
CY | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
GR | 18.01.2013 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 17.10.2012 | |
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 17.10.2012 | |
NL | 17.10.2012 | ||
SE | 17.10.2012 | ||
ES | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 17.10.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2153488 (NIPPON PISTON RING CO LTD) [A] 1-3* figures 1,2; claims 1-7 *; | [A]EP0486320 (TEIKOKU PISTON RING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 20; figures 1-12; claims 1,9 * | International search | [A]JP2002030394 (RIKEN KK, et al); | [AE]JP2003287130 (RIKEN KK); | [AE]JP2003313649 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) | Examination | JPS585456 | US5176760 | US5308089 | JPH06325946 | JPH07316778 | GB2315079 | by applicant | JPS53147309 | JPS62223545 | JPS6481015 | JPH05332451 | JPH07316778 |