EP1552736 - RUGGEDIZED ELECTRONICS ENCLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Themis Computer 47200 Bayside Parkway Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [2006/31] |
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states Themis Computer 3185 Laurelview Court Fremont, CA 94538 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEHRET, William 14006 Broadway Terrace Oakland, CA 94611 / US | 02 /
SMITH, Dennis, H. 43892 N. Moray Street Fremont, CA 94539 / US | [2005/28] | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/28] | Rupp, Christian, Dipl.-Phys. Mitscherlich & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03791711.9 | 20.08.2003 | [2005/28] | WO2003US26134 | Priority number, date | US20020232915 | 30.08.2002 Original published format: US 232915 | [2005/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004021401 | Date: | 11.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1552736 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.05.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/14, H05K7/20 | [2010/10] | CPC: |
H05K7/20418 (EP,US);
H05K7/1434 (EP,US);
H05K7/20254 (EP,US);
H05K7/20445 (EP,US);
H05K7/20509 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/28] | H05K7/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROBUSTES ELEKTRONIKGEHAUSE | [2005/28] | English: | RUGGEDIZED ELECTRONICS ENCLOSURE | [2005/28] | French: | BOITIER ELECTRONIQUE RENFORCE | [2005/28] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2005 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 04.03.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5669524 (LOEDEL CHRIS W [US]) [X] 1-13,25-59 * abstract * * figures 1-15 * * column 1, lines 23-28 * * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 8 * * column 2, lines 17-20 * * column 3, lines 25-35 * * column 3, lines 61-66 * * column 5, line 59 - column 6, line 4 *[A] 14-24,60-71 | International search | [X]US6215658 (BODINI AMEDEO [IT]); | [Y]US5808866 (PORTER ANTHONY W [US]); | [A]US5282114 (STONE ROBERT J [US]); | [A]US5999406 (MCKAIN JAMES A [US], et al); | [A]US6330152 (VOS DAVID L [US], et al) |