EP1539272 - MULTI-LUMEN CATHETER WITH INTEGRATED CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arrow International, Inc. 2400 Bernville Road Reading Pennsylvania 19605 / US | [2019/24] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Arrow International, Inc. 2400 Bernville Road Reading, Pennsylvania 19605 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILSON, Jon, S. 1011 Kent Mews Ct. Winston-Salem, NC 27104 / US | 02 /
CASSIDY, Kenneth, T. 866 Farmington Road Mocksville, NC 34990 / US | 03 /
MARTEL, Mark, C. 325 Lake Point Lane Blues Creek, NC 27009 / US | [2007/03] |
Former [2005/24] | 01 /
WILSON, Jon, S. 965 Avon Road Winston-Salem, NC 27104 / US | ||
02 /
CASSIDY, Kenneth, T. 866 Farmington Road Mocksville, NC 34990 / US | |||
03 /
MARTEL, Mark, C. 325 Lake Point Lane Blues Creek, NC 27009 / US | Representative(s) | von Hirschhausen, Helge Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Straße 14 80335 München / DE | [2011/40] |
Former [2008/45] | Paemen, Liesbet R.J., et al De Clercq, Brants & Partners E. Gevaertdreef 10 A 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | ||
Former [2005/24] | De Clercq, Ann, et al De Clercq, Brants & Partners c.v., Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | Application number, filing date | 03791898.4 | 28.08.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003US26967 | Priority number, date | US20020231577 | 30.08.2002 Original published format: US 231577 | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004020016 | Date: | 11.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1539272 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1539272 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.05.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00, A61M25/01, A61M39/10, A61M39/12 | [2018/42] | CPC: |
A61M25/0194 (EP,US);
A61M25/0069 (EP,US);
A61M39/105 (EP,US);
A61M39/12 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0019 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0031 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0037 (EP,US);
A61M25/0028 (EP,US);
A61M25/0029 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/24] | A61M3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/24] |
Former [2005/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MULTILUMEN-KATHETER MIT INTEGRIERTEM VERBINDUNGSSTÜCK | [2005/24] | English: | MULTI-LUMEN CATHETER WITH INTEGRATED CONNECTOR | [2005/24] | French: | CATHETER MULTILUMIERE A RACCORD INTEGRE | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2005 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 22.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.04.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 01.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.08.2003 | AT | 12.06.2019 | CY | 12.06.2019 | CZ | 12.06.2019 | DK | 12.06.2019 | EE | 12.06.2019 | ES | 12.06.2019 | FI | 12.06.2019 | IT | 12.06.2019 | MC | 12.06.2019 | NL | 12.06.2019 | RO | 12.06.2019 | SE | 12.06.2019 | SI | 12.06.2019 | SK | 12.06.2019 | TR | 12.06.2019 | IE | 28.08.2019 | LU | 28.08.2019 | BE | 31.08.2019 | CH | 31.08.2019 | LI | 31.08.2019 | BG | 12.09.2019 | GR | 13.09.2019 | PT | 14.10.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 28.08.2019 | ||
LU | 28.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 28.08.2019 | ||
LU | 28.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IE | 28.08.2019 | ||
LU | 28.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LU | 28.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 12.06.2019 | |
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | ES | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | ES | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4796615 (BULLOCK JAMES K [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * sentence 53, paragraph 3 - sentence 58 * * figure 6 *; | [A]EP0415665 (KENDALL & CO [US]) [A] 1-18 * column 7, line 41 - column 8, line 2 ** figure 3 *; | [A]EP0930083 (EPIMED INT INC [US]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * figure 11 *; | [Y]US6117128 (GREGORY KENTON W [US]) [Y] 1-18 * column 6, line 43 - line 49 * * figures 7-9 * | International search | [A]US4643711 (BATES BRIAN L [US]); | [A]US4895561 (MAHURKAR SAKHARAM D [US]); | [A]US5053023 (MARTIN GEOFFREY S [CA]); | [A]US5624413 (MARKEL DAVID F [US], et al); | [A]US5776111 (TESIO FRANCO [IT]); | [A]US5797869 (MARTIN GEOFFREY S [CA], et al); | [A]US5989213 (MAGINOT THOMAS J [US]); | [AP]US2003088213 (SCHWEIKERT TIMOTHY [US], et al); | [AE]US6638242 (WILSON JON S [US], et al) | by applicant | US4895561 | US5776111 |