EP1535303 - GAS TUBE END CAP FOR A MICROWAVE PLASMA GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.05.2006 [2006/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axcelis Technologies Inc. 55 Cherry Hill Drive Beverly, MA 01915-1053 / US | [2005/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Albert 184 Calle de Mesa Morega, CA 94556 / US | [2005/22] | Representative(s) | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/22] | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03792005.5 | 29.08.2003 | [2005/22] | WO2003US27395 | Priority number, date | US20020408013P | 30.08.2002 Original published format: US 408013 P | [2005/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004021392 | Date: | 11.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1535303 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
H01J37/32192 (EP,US);
H01J37/32357 (EP,US);
H01J37/3244 (EP,US);
H01J37/32458 (EP,US);
H01J49/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/51] |
Former [2005/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABSCHLUSSKAPPE FÜR DAS GASROHR EINES MIKROWELLEN-PLASMAGENERATORS | [2005/22] | English: | GAS TUBE END CAP FOR A MICROWAVE PLASMA GENERATOR | [2005/22] | French: | COIFFE D'EXTREMITE D'UN TUBE A GAZ DESTINEE A UN GENERATEUR DE PLASMA MICRO-ONDES | [2005/22] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 21.03.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0800200 (APPLIED KOMATSU TECHNOLOGY INC [JP]) [X] 1-24 * the whole document * * column 4, line 30 - column 10, line 26; figures 1,3 *; | [X]EP1039502 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [X] 1-3,8,14-16,18-21,24 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019]; figure 2 * |