EP1543602 - A ROTOR FOR A PERMANENT-MAGNET ELECTRICAL MACHINE AND A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/03] | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states ABB Oy Strömbergintie 1 00380 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOLEHMAINEN, Jere Mörskynkatu 1 FIN-66510 Merikaarto / FI | 02 /
PEKOLA, Jari Hauentie 23-25-B 14 FIN-65200 Vaasa / FI | 03 /
IKÄHEIMO, Jouni Tassintie 8 FIN-61300 Kurikka / FI | [2005/25] | Representative(s) | Korpelainen, Seppo Ilmari ABB Oy P.O. Box 210 Strömbergintie 1B 00381 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2005/25] | Korpelainen, Seppo Ilmari ABB Oy, Legal Affairs/Patents, P.O. Box 210 00381 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 03792444.6 | 26.08.2003 | [2005/25] | WO2003FI00621 | Priority number, date | FI20020001524 | 26.08.2002 Original published format: FI 20021524 | [2005/25] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004019467 | Date: | 04.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1543602 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 04.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/27 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
H02K1/2781 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROTOR FÜR EINE ELEKTRISCHE PERMANENTMAGNETMASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2005/25] | English: | A ROTOR FOR A PERMANENT-MAGNET ELECTRICAL MACHINE AND A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING IT | [2005/25] | French: | ROTOR DE MACHINE ELECTRIQUE A AIMANT PERMANENT ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ASSOCIE | [2005/25] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2004 | Translation filed | 22.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 03.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/32] | 27.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4658165 (VANDERSCHAEGHE CHRISTIAN [FR]); | [X]JPH11252840 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD); | [A]EP0955714 (ABB MOTORS OY [FI]); | [A]DE19851883 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [Y]DE19915664 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |