EP1548863 - ELECTROLYTE MEMBRANE, MEMBRANE ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY USING THIS AND FUEL CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINO, Norihisa 8-1-30-B601, Ayameikeminami Nara-shi, Nara 631-0033 / JP | 02 /
HOJO, Nobuhiko 9-25, Narita-cho Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0004 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Aoi 1-13-4, Shitennouji, Tennouji-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 543-0051 / JP | 04 /
AKIYAMA, Takashi 5-15-B-203, Niina Minoo-shi, Osaka 562-0005 / JP | 05 /
OKADA, Yukihiro 3-8-303, Myokenzaka Katano-shi, Osaka 576-0021 / JP | 06 /
YUASA, Kohji 8-17, Nagisahigashimachi Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1176 / JP | 07 /
INATOMI, Yuu 1-24-11, Saigodori Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-0034 / JP | 08 /
YAMAMOTO, Taisuke 4-1-41, Katsuyamakita, Ikuno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 544-0033 / JP | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Matthews, Derek Peter Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2005/26] | Matthews, Derek Peter Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03792635.9 | 24.07.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003JP09368 | Priority number, date | JP20020217247 | 25.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002217247 | [2005/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004019439 | Date: | 04.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1548863 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02, H01M8/10, H01B1/06 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
H01M8/1053 (EP,US);
H01B1/122 (EP,US);
H01M8/1004 (EP,US);
H01M8/106 (EP,US);
H01M8/1062 (EP,US);
H01M2008/1095 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0082 (EP,US);
H01M6/181 (EP,US);
H01M8/1011 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Title | German: | ELEKTROLYTMEMBRAM, DIESE VERWENDENDE MEMBRAN-ELEKTRODEN-ANORDNUNG UND BRENNSTOFFZELLE | [2005/26] | English: | ELECTROLYTE MEMBRANE, MEMBRANE ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY USING THIS AND FUEL CELL | [2005/26] | French: | MEMBRANE ELECTROLYTIQUE, ENSEMBLE D'ELECTRODES COMPORTANT UNE TELLE MEMBRANE, ET PILE A COMBUSTIBLE | [2005/26] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2005 | Translation filed | 10.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 10.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 24.06.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2002203576 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV); | [X]JP2002083612 (YAMAGUCHI TAKEHISA, et al); | [X]WO0054351 (CENTER FOR ADVANCED SCIENCE AN [JP], et al); | [X]WO9013593 (GORE & ASS [US], et al); | [A]JPH0629032 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [A]JPH11339827 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [XE]JP2003263999 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) |