EP1534477 - LOW-COST RING BLADE FOR ROTARY KNIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BETTCHER INDUSTRIES, INC. 6801 State Route 60 Birmingham Ohio 44816 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states BETTCHER INDUSTRIES, INC. 6801 State Route 60 Birmingham Ohio 44816 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEOFFREY, D., Rapp 31571 Schwartz Road Westlake, OH 44145 / US | [2005/22] | Representative(s) | Wise, Stephen James, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Wise, Stephen James, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2005/22] | Wise, Stephen James, et al Raworth Moss & Cook Raworth House 36 Sydenham Road Croydon, Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 03794498.0 | 22.08.2003 | WO2003US26461 | Priority number, date | US20020408769P | 06.09.2002 Original published format: US 408769 P | [2005/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004022290 | Date: | 18.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1534477 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B26B25/00, B21D53/64 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
A22B5/165 (EP,US);
A22C17/004 (EP,US);
B26B25/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/52] |
Former [2005/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | ||
Former [N/P] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOSTENGÜNSTIGE RINGFÖRMIGE KLINGE FÜR ROTATIONSMESSER | [2005/22] | English: | LOW-COST RING BLADE FOR ROTARY KNIVES | [2005/22] | French: | LAME ANNULAIRE PEU COUTEUSE POUR COUTEAUX ROTATIFS | [2005/22] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.03.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 31.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/27] | 14.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO0141980 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [X] 1,5,11,12 * page 10, line 1 - line 28; figure 1 * * claims 1,2,4,5 * * page 13, line 1 - line 14; figure 3 * * page 8, line 25 - line 32; claim 6 * [Y] 4,2,3,7; | [A]WO0124977 (BETTCHER INDUSTRIES [US], et al) [A] 1,2,11 * page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 9; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]EP1226907 (BETTCHER INDUSTRIES [US]) [Y] 2 * paragraphs [0012] , [0034]; figures 1,4 *; | [A]FR1445531 (BETTCHER INDUSTRIES) [A] 2 * page 2, paragraph 8; figure 4 *; | [Y]GB951857 (GILLETTE FRANCE S A) [Y] 3,7 * page 1, line 33 - line 49; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]GB327636 (FORTUNA WERKE SPEZIALMASCHINEN) [A] 3,7 * page 1, line 10 - line 97; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]GB1370428 (DAVALL GEAR CO LTD) [A] 4,14 * the whole document *; | [AY]US3241391 (BORRO SR EDWARD F, et al) [A] 14 * the whole document * [Y] 4; | [A]US4143973 (HAUSER HANS) [A] * column 2, line 13 - column 3, line 17; figures 1,2 * |