EP1540078 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING AND/OR TREATING A FIBROUS STRIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2011 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/36] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Voith Paper Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAYER, Roland Humboldtstr. 22 89522 Heidenheim / DE | 02 /
STEIN, Antje Am Ugental 23 89518 Heidenheim / DE | 03 /
OECHSLE, Markus Falkenbergweg 23 73566 Bartholomae / DE | 04 /
WEGEHAUPT, Frank Ravensburger Str 58 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2010/29] |
Former [2007/01] | 01 /
MAYER, Roland Humboldtstr. 22 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
02 /
STEIN, Antje Adlerstr. 5 89518 Heidenheim / DE | |||
03 /
OECHSLE, Markus Falkenbergweg 23 73566 Bartholomae / DE | |||
04 /
WEGEHAUPT, Frank Stergweg 10 89079 Ulm / DE | |||
Former [2005/24] | 01 /
MAYER, Roland Robert-Koch-Str. 60 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
02 /
STEIN, Antje Adlerstr. 5 89518 Heidenheim / DE | |||
03 /
OECHSLE, Markus Falkenbergweg 23 73566 Bartholomae / DE | |||
04 /
WEGEHAUPT, Frank Stergweg 10 89079 Ulm / DE | Application number, filing date | 03795022.7 | 28.07.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003EP50337 | Priority number, date | DE2002141944 | 10.09.2002 Original published format: DE 10241944 | [2005/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004025023 | Date: | 25.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1540078 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1540078 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | D21G7/00 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
D21F5/00 (EP);
D21G1/0093 (EP);
D21G7/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND/ODER BEHANDLUNG EINER FASERSTOFFBAHN | [2005/24] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING AND/OR TREATING A FIBROUS STRIP | [2005/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET/OU TRAITEMENT D'UNE BANDE DE MATIERE FIBREUSE | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 28.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.09.2010 | CZ | 08.09.2010 | DK | 08.09.2010 | EE | 08.09.2010 | HU | 08.09.2010 | IE | 08.09.2010 | IT | 08.09.2010 | NL | 08.09.2010 | RO | 08.09.2010 | SE | 08.09.2010 | SI | 08.09.2010 | SK | 08.09.2010 | TR | 08.09.2010 | BG | 08.12.2010 | GR | 09.12.2010 | ES | 19.12.2010 | PT | 10.01.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 08.09.2010 | |
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
TR | 08.09.2010 | ||
BG | 08.12.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CY | 08.09.2010 | |
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
BG | 08.12.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | CY | 08.09.2010 | |
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | CY | 08.09.2010 | |
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 08.09.2010 | |
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CY | 08.09.2010 | |
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 08.09.2010 | |
IE | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | CY | 08.09.2010 | |
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CY | 08.09.2010 | |
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 08.09.2010 | |
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | SI | 08.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5286348 (PERIN DIDIER J [CA]) [A] 1,3,4,15,16,22-24,33,35,38 * column W *; | [X]US5416980 (ILVESPAEAE HEIKKI [FI]) [X] 1,2,9,12,15,16,19,22,24,29,32,33,35,36,39 * column W *; | [X]EP0742313 (VOITH SULZER PAPIERMASCH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,9,18,22,24,29,30,32,33,35,36 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0000696 (VALMET CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1,24,29,32,33,35,36 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10055999 (VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | US5416980 | EP0742313 | WO0000696 | DE19949236 |