EP1538043 - MOTION CONTROL DEVICE OF VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVICS CO., LTD 2-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8650 / JP | For all designated states DAIHATSU MOTOR COMPANY, LTD. 1-1, Daihatsu-cho Ikeda-shi Osaka-fu 563-8651 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | For all designated states ADVICS CO., LTD. 2-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8650 / JP | ||
For all designated states DAIHATSU MOTOR COMPANY, LTD. 1-1, Daihatsu-cho Ikeda-shi Osaka-fu 563-8651 / JP | |||
Former [2005/23] | For all designated states Advics Co., Ltd. 2-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-city, Aichi-pref. 448-8650 / JP | ||
For all designated states DAIHATSU MOTOR COMPANY, LTD. 1-1, Daihatsu-cho Ikeda-shi, Osaka-fu 563-8651 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Toshihisa c/o Advics Co., Ltd., 2-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | 02 /
Fukami, Masanobu c/o Advics Co., Ltd., 2-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | 03 /
Yakushijin, Tokio c/o Daihatsu Motor Co., Ltd., 1-1, Daihatsu-cho Ikeda-shi, Osaka 563-8651 / JP | [2005/23] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/23] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03795203.3 | 28.07.2003 | [2005/23] | WO2003JP09515 | Priority number, date | JP20020263574 | 10.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002263574 | [2005/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004024522 | Date: | 25.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1538043 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1538043 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.03.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/00, B60C23/00 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
B60T8/1755 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/23] | B60T8/58 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/52] |
Former [2005/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BEWEGUNGSSTEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR FAHRZEUG | [2005/23] | English: | MOTION CONTROL DEVICE OF VEHICLE | [2005/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONTROLE DES MOUVEMENTS D'UN VEHICULE | [2005/23] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2004 | Translation filed | 09.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2004 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 09.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]JPH0115524 ; | [X]JPH07257349 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2000233732 (AISIN SEIKI); | [Y]JP2000318416 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al); | [XE]JP2003226235 (MAZDA MOTOR) | Examination | WO03093081 | WO2004007235 | by applicant | JPH07257349 | DE10225447 |