EP1548627 - SERVICE PROVIDING SYSTEM, INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.09.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUDA, Junko, Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 02 /
NAKANO, Hiroaki, Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 03 /
KARASAWA, Hidenori, Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 04 /
IKEDA, Takuo, Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 05 /
KANNO, Ryuta, Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 06 /
SUEYOSHI, Takahiko, Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 07 /
MURATA, Makoto, Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 08 /
GOTO, Hiroshi, Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 09 /
AMEMIYA, Ryoji, Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 10 /
TAMAI, Hiroki, Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | Körber, Martin, Dipl.-Phys., et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03795346.0 | 10.09.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003JP11534 | Priority number, date | JP20020264772 | 10.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002264772 | [2005/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004025532 | Date: | 25.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1548627 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.03.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0641 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/52] |
Former [2005/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIENSTBEREITSTELLUNGSSYSTEM, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSEINRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2005/26] | English: | SERVICE PROVIDING SYSTEM, INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2005/26] | French: | SYSTEME FOURNISSEUR DE SERVICES, DISPOSITIF PROCESSEUR D'INFORMATIONS, PROCEDE ET PROGRAMME | [2005/26] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2005 | Translation filed | 23.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 23.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 27.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.11.2018 | 06.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/04] | 16.09.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/04] | 09.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 16   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0161671 (GOREN OFER [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * abstract * * page 2, line 17 - page 6, line 13 * * page 6, line 30 - page 8, line 27 * * page 10, line 13 - page 11, line 26 *; | [X]WO0176173 (SAVERFONE LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-25 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - page 5, line 16 * * page 7, lines 9-14 *; | [A]WO0208854 (C5 SOLUTIONS PTE LTD [SG]) [A] 1-25 * abstract * * page 2, line 15 - page 5, line 16 ** page 6, line 6 - page 16, line 16 *; | [X]WO0213552 (GRAVITATE INC [US]) [X] 1-25 * abstract * * page 3, paragraphs 7-10 * * page 6, paragraph 30 - page 8, paragraph 38 * * page 10, paragraphs 44,45 *; | [X]US2002091568 (KRAFT REINER [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 3 * * page 1, paragraph 7 - page 3, paragraph 26 * * page 3, paragraph 37 - page 9, paragraph 196 * | International search | [Y]JP2002197109 (IMD KK); | [Y]JP2001344352 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JP2002073670 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]JP2002175465 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) | Examination | US2001049471 |